EP2208279 - WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER USING MAGNETO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated(1/3) 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMINIAK, Stephen 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
WIDMER, Hanspeter 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
COOK, Nigel, P. 5775 Morehouse Drive San diego, CA 92121 / US | [2010/29] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08836964.0 | 13.10.2008 | [2010/29] | WO2008US79681 | Priority number, date | US20070979381P | 11.10.2007 Original published format: US 979381 P | [2010/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009049281 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2208279 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, H02J5/00 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
H04B5/79 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/12 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/70 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/90 (KR);
H04B5/24 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/29] | H02J17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/29] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSER STROMTRANSFER UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MAGNETOMECHANISCHEN SYSTEMEN | [2010/29] | English: | WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER USING MAGNETO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS | [2010/29] | French: | TRANSFERT DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL UTILISANT DES SYSTÈMES MAGNÉTO-MÉCANIQUES | [2010/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 30.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006106456 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 2 ** the whole document *; | [A]JP2006296144 (HAYASHIZAKI SHINICHI, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]US7256532 (VIEHLAND DWIGHT DOUGLAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1b * * column 3, line 5 - line 27 * | International search | [A]US4088999 (FLETCHER JAMES C ADMINISTRATOR, et al); | [A]US5982139 (PARISE RONALD J [US]); | [A]US6507152 (MATSUMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US7154451 (SIEVENPIPER DANIEL F [US]); | [A] - TSUYOSHI SEKITANI ET AL., "A large-area wireless power-transmission sheet using printed organic transistors and plastic MEMS switches", NATURE MATERIALS LETTER, (200706), vol. 6, pages 413 - 417, XP008133232 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmat1903 | [A] - NAOKI SHINOHARA ET AL., "Experimental Study of Large Rectenna Array for Microwave Energy Transmission", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, (199803), vol. 46, pages 261 - 268, XP008133231 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.661713 | [A] - DONG-GI YOUN ET AL., "A Study on the Fundamental Transmission Experiment for Wireless Power Transmission System", IEEE Conference, TENCON 99, (199909), vol. 2, pages 1419 - 1422, XP010368542 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TENCON.1999.818697 | [A] - TAE-WHAN YOO ET AL., "Theoretical and Experimental Development of 10 and 35 GHz Rectennas", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, (199206), vol. 40, pages 1259 - 1266, XP000278046 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.141359 | [A] - MCSPADDEN J.O. ET AL., "Theoretical and Experimental Investigation of a Rectenna Element for Microwave Power Transmission", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, (199212), vol. 40, pages 2359 - 2366, XP000335897 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.179902 | [A] - MCSPADDEN J.O. ET AL., "A High Conversion Efficiency 5.8 GHz Rectenna", IEEE Microwave Symposium, (199706), vol. 2, pages 547 - 550, XP010228484 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSYM.1997.602852 |