EP2203191 - DEVICE FOR STERILIZING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUMER, Roland Von-der-Tann-Str. 23 93047 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
SCHMID, Manfred Benediktinerstr. 4 93089 Aufhausen / DE | 03 /
BERTHOLD, Burgmeier Schloss Eglingen 6 89561 Dischingen/Eglingen / DE | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Hannke, Christian Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Hannke, Christian Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ägidienplatz 7 93047 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/27] | Hannke, Christian Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwalte Ägidienplatz 7 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08837018.4 | 30.09.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008EP63090 | Priority number, date | DE20071047259 | 02.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007047259 | [2010/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009047171 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203191 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2203191 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/20, B67C7/00 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
B67C7/0073 (EP,US);
A61L2/208 (EP,US);
A61L2202/122 (EP,US);
A61L2202/23 (EP,US);
B67C2003/228 (EP,US);
B67C2003/2694 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM STERILISIEREN VON BEHÄLTNISSEN | [2010/27] | English: | DEVICE FOR STERILIZING CONTAINERS | [2010/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR STÉRILISER DES RÉCIPIENTS | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 29.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2008 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | ES | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | HR | 23.10.2013 | LT | 23.10.2013 | LV | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | MT | 23.10.2013 | NL | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | NO | 23.01.2014 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.09.2008 | |
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 23.10.2013 | |
NO | 23.01.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB407672 (FRED SCHLOER); | [DA]EP1601606 (SIG TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]); | [A]EP1821010 (KHS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0036]; figure 4 * |