EP2195571 - BOTTLE TREATMENT SYSTEM HAVING SAFETY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZECH, Thomas Frankenstrasse 7 93093 Donaustauf / DE | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08837757.7 | 30.09.2008 | [2010/24] | WO2008EP08301 | Priority number, date | DE20071047733 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007047733 | [2010/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009046910 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2195571 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2195571 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16P3/08, B67C7/00 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
F16P3/08 (EP,US);
B65G43/00 (EP,US);
B65G69/00 (EP,US);
B67C3/007 (EP,US);
B67C7/00 (EP,US);
B67C7/0073 (EP,US);
B65G2207/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Title | German: | FLASCHENBEHANDLUNGSANLAGE MIT SICHERHEITSEINRICHTUNG | [2010/24] | English: | BOTTLE TREATMENT SYSTEM HAVING SAFETY UNIT | [2010/24] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE BOUTEILLES AVEC DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE | [2010/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 17.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2008 | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | DK | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | HR | 18.01.2012 | IE | 18.01.2012 | LT | 18.01.2012 | LV | 18.01.2012 | MT | 18.01.2012 | NL | 18.01.2012 | PL | 18.01.2012 | RO | 18.01.2012 | SE | 18.01.2012 | SI | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | TR | 18.01.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | NO | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.04.2012 | ES | 29.04.2012 | IS | 18.05.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | GB | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | LU | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
GB | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
LU | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
GB | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
GB | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
GB | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 18.01.2012 | |
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 18.01.2012 | |
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 18.01.2012 | |
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 18.01.2012 | |
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1597918 (VICKERS LTD) [Y] 1-7 * page 1, line 24 - line 46 * * page 2, line 7 - line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE3823032 (KRONSEDER MASCHF KRONES [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * column 1, line 1 - line 7; figure 1 * * column 3, line 45 - line 54 * * column 4, line 6 - line 28 * * column 5, line 30 - line 46 *; | [A]GB2261045 (EMHART INC [US]) [A] 1,2,5,7 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 21; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US6325195 (DOHERTY STEVEN G [US]) [A] 1,5* column 5; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102005041531 (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 6 * paragraph [0024]; figures 1-4 * | Examination | DE19928325 | by applicant | DE2436591 | DE2506409 | DE2507419 | GB1597918 | DE3823032 | GB2261045 | DE19928325 | US6325195 | DE102005041531 |