EP2202235 - BIS(TRIMETHYLSILYL)PHENYL COMPOUND OR SALT THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-27 Kandanishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8444 / JP | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUDA, Yoshimitsu c/o TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. 1-27 Misugidai Hanno-shi Saitama 357-8527 / JP | 02 /
OSHIUMI, Hiromi c/o TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. 1-27 Misugidai Hanno-shi Saitama 357-8527 / JP | 03 /
MURAKAMI, Koji c/o TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. 1-27 Misugidai Hanno-shi Saitama 357-8527 / JP | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08837758.5 | 10.10.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008JP68421 | Priority number, date | JP20070265464 | 11.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007265464 | [2010/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009048123 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2202235 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/10, C07F7/12, A61K31/695, A61P17/06, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/06, A61P43/00 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
C07F7/0812 (EP,US);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | BIS(TRIMETHYLSILYL)PHENYLVERBINDUNG ODER SALZ DARAUS UND VERWENDUNG | [2010/26] | English: | BIS(TRIMETHYLSILYL)PHENYL COMPOUND OR SALT THEREOF, AND USE THEREOF | [2010/26] | French: | COMPOSÉ BIS(TRIMÉTHYLSILYL)PHÉNYLE OU UN SEL DE CELUI-CI, ET UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2010 | Translation filed | 30.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 19.08.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0337176 (SHUDO KOICHI) [A] 1-12 * page 20; claims 1, 7 *; | [A]EP0768084 (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * page 8; claim 1 * * page 9; claim 9 *; | [A]EP1048659 (INST MED MOLECULAR DESIGN INC [JP]) [A] 1-12* page 34; claim 1 * | International search | [A]JPH02247185 (SHUDO KOICHI); | [A]WO9632101 (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH02247185 | WO9632101 | - JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (199205), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 839 - 864 | - BLOOD., (19960301), vol. 87, no. 5, pages 1939 - 1950 | - DEVELOPMENT, (199111), vol. 113, no. 3, pages 723 - 734 | - AM. J. PHYSIOL., (199507), vol. 269, pages E91 - E98 | - JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (2002), vol. 20, no. 16, pages 3522 - 3532 | - DEVELOPMENT OF PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, (1990), vol. 7, pages 163 - 198 | - B. E. MARYANOFF ET AL., CHEM. REV., (1989), vol. 89, pages 863 - 927 | - HECK, R. F., ORG. REACT., (1982), vol. 27, pages 345 - 390 | - TAKERU YAMAKAWA. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1990), vol. 33, no. 5 | - M. JESBERGER, SYNTHESIS, (2003), vol. 12, pages 1920 - 1927 |