EP2228115 - CORDIERITE CERAMIC HONEYCOMB FILTER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8614 / JP | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAZAKI, Shunji c/o Hitachi Metals Ltd. 35 Nagahama-cho Kandamachi Miyako-gun Fukuoka 800-0393 / JP | 02 /
ISHIZAWA, Toshitaka c/o Hitachi Metals Ltd. 35 Nagahama-cho Kandamachi Miyako-gun Fukuoka 800-0393 / JP | [2013/50] |
Former [2010/37] | 01 /
OKAZAKI, Shunji c/o Hitachi Metals Ltd. 35 Nagahama-cho Kandamachi Miyako-gun Fukuoka 800-0393 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIZAWA, Toshitaka c/o Hitachi Metals Ltd. 35 Nagahama-cho Kandamachi Miyako-gun Fukuoka 800-0393 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2013/50] |
Former [2010/37] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08838157.9 | 14.10.2008 | [2010/37] | WO2008JP68605 | Priority number, date | JP20070267119 | 12.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007267119 | [2010/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009048156 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2228115 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2228115 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/20, C04B38/06, F01N3/02 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
B01D46/2429 (EP,US);
B01D46/24491 (EP,US);
B01D46/24492 (EP,US);
B01D46/24493 (EP,US);
B01D46/2498 (EP,US);
C04B35/195 (EP,US);
C04B35/62665 (EP,US);
B01D2275/30 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3218 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/349 (EP,US);
C04B2235/528 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5296 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5481 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0006, C04B35/195, C04B38/0054, C04B38/007, C04B38/0074 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/37] | Title | German: | CORDIERIT-KERAMIKWABENFILTER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2010/37] | English: | CORDIERITE CERAMIC HONEYCOMB FILTER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2010/37] | French: | FILTRE CÉRAMIQUE EN NID D'ABEILLES EN CORDIÉRITE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2010/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2010 | Translation filed | 10.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 15.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2008 | AT | 11.12.2013 | BE | 11.12.2013 | BG | 11.12.2013 | CY | 11.12.2013 | CZ | 11.12.2013 | DK | 11.12.2013 | EE | 11.12.2013 | ES | 11.12.2013 | FI | 11.12.2013 | HR | 11.12.2013 | IT | 11.12.2013 | LT | 11.12.2013 | LV | 11.12.2013 | MC | 11.12.2013 | MT | 11.12.2013 | NL | 11.12.2013 | PL | 11.12.2013 | RO | 11.12.2013 | SE | 11.12.2013 | SI | 11.12.2013 | SK | 11.12.2013 | TR | 11.12.2013 | NO | 11.03.2014 | GR | 12.03.2014 | IS | 11.04.2014 | PT | 11.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.10.2008 | |
AT | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
TR | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 11.12.2013 | |
NO | 11.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004261384 (MERKEL GREGORY A [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 1; example 6 *; | [A]WO2007108428 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0086]; tables 1,2 *; | [E]EP1997788 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-8 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0086]; tables 1,2 * | International search | [X]JP2002219319 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [Y]WO2005090263 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2005296936 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [A]JP2005324154 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [A]JP2006095352 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [A]JP2007045686 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) | by applicant | JPS61129015 | JP2002219319 | JP2003193820 | JP2004250324 | JP2004322082 |