EP2197935 - STABILIZATION OF POLYURETHANE FOAM POLYOL PREMIXES CONTAINING HALOGENATED OLEFIN BLOWING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Opposition rejected | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Law Department AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, David J. 6202 Shamrock Lane Amherst New York 14051 / US | 02 /
VANDERPUY, Michael 3 Exeter Road Amherst New York 14221 / US | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/34] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/29] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/25] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08838493.8 | 06.10.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008US78887 | Priority number, date | US20070979427P | 12.10.2007 Original published format: US 979427 P | US20080241534 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: US 241534 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009048826 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2197935 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2197935 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08K5/541, C08G18/18, C08G18/40, C08J9/06, C08J9/14 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
C08G18/089 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (KR);
C08G18/1808 (EP,CN,US);
C08J9/146 (US);
C07C17/08 (KR);
C08G18/08 (KR);
C08G18/14 (US);
C08G18/40 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/7671 (US);
C08J9/04 (KR);
C08J9/06 (EP,US);
C08J9/08 (CN);
C08J9/149 (EP,CN,US);
C08K5/541 (EP,US);
C08G2101/00 (EP,CN,US);
C08G2115/02 (EP,US);
C08J2203/06 (EP,CN,US);
C08J2203/10 (US);
C08J2203/14 (EP,CN,US);
C08J2203/142 (EP,CN,US);
C08J2203/162 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/541, C08L75/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/44] | C08G18/10, C08G18/40, C08J9/04, C07C17/08, C08G18/18, C08J9/14, C08K5/541 | ||
Former IPC [2010/25] | C08G18/10, C08G18/40, C08J9/04, C07C17/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILISIERUNG VON POLYURETHANSCHAUMSTOFF-POLYOL-VORMISCHUNGEN MIT HALOGENIERTEN OLEFIN-BLASMITTELN | [2010/25] | English: | STABILIZATION OF POLYURETHANE FOAM POLYOL PREMIXES CONTAINING HALOGENATED OLEFIN BLOWING AGENTS | [2010/25] | French: | STABILISATION DE PRÉMÉLANGES À BASE DE POLYOL POUR MOUSSE DE POLYURÉTHANE CONTENANT DES AGENTS GONFLANTS À BASE D'OLÉFINE HALOGÉNÉE | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 09.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.05.2014
12.06.2017
WITHDRAWN ARKEMA France 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR Opponent's representative Dang, Doris, et al, et al ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.05.2014
12.06.2017
WITHDRAWN ARKEMA France 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR Opponent's representative Dang, Doris, et al, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2014/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.05.2014
WITHDRAWN ARKEMA France 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR Opponent's representative Dang, Doris, et al, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | 27.06.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.04.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.05.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.06.2016 | 31.05.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 10.06.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/32] | 29.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 29.06.2016 | Appeal received No. T1551/16 | 21.09.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.06.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | HR | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | LU | 06.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | NO | 21.11.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | BG | 21.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
LU | 06.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 21.08.2013 | |
HR | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | HR | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
NO | 21.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 21.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003144372 (KOMETANI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * examples 9-19; tables 3,5 * * claims 1-5 *; | [A]US2007010592 (BOWMAN JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * examples 3-6 * * claims 1-68 *; | [A]US2007100009 (CREAZZO JOSEPH A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * examples 1-11 * * claims 1-26 *; | [AP]FR2913425 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [AP] 1-15 * examples 1-2 ** claims 1-7 * | International search | [A]WO9714730 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]JP2001026625 (AIR PROD & CHEM); | [A]JP2001240649 (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]US6337356 (ZASCHKE BERND [DE], et al); | [A]WO2007002625 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) | Examination | US2002123598 |