EP2197816 - METHOD OF DIRECT SYNTHESIS OF LIGHT HYDROCARBONS FROM NATURAL GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Chemical Technology 141, Gajeong-ro Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 34114 / KR | [2018/29] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Korea Research Institute Of Chemical Technology 100, Jang-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-343 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAE, Jong-Wook 207 dormitory Korea Research Institute of Chemical Technology Jang-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-343 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Suk-Hwan 301-709 Songgang Green Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-751 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Yun-Jo 101-704 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 04 /
JUN, Ki-won 305-1602 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | [2018/43] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
BAE, Jong-Wook 207 dormitory Korea Research Institute of Chemical Technology Jang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-343 / KR | ||
02 /
KANG, Suk-Hwan 301-709 Songgang Green Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-751 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Yun-Jo 101-704 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | |||
04 /
JUN, Ki-won 305-1602 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2018/43] |
Former [2010/25] | WSL Patentanwälte Taunusstraße 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 08838757.6 | 22.09.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008KR05608 | Priority number, date | KR20070103677 | 15.10.2007 Original published format: KR 20070103677 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009051353 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2197816 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2197816 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C10G2/00, C07C1/04, // B01J29/072, B01J29/24, B01J29/04, B01J29/46, B01J29/68, B01J29/14, C01B3/38 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
B01J29/146 (EP);
C07C1/06 (KR);
B01J29/072 (EP);
B01J29/24 (EP);
B01J29/46 (EP);
B01J29/68 (EP);
C01B3/382 (EP);
C01B3/384 (EP);
C07C1/04 (KR);
C10G2/332 (EP);
C10G2/334 (EP);
B01J2229/186 (EP);
C01B2203/0233 (EP);
C01B2203/0238 (EP);
C01B2203/0283 (EP);
C01B2203/0405 (EP);
C01B2203/043 (EP);
C01B2203/0475 (EP);
C01B2203/062 (EP);
C01B2203/0833 (EP);
C01B2203/1058 (EP);
C01B2203/1241 (EP);
C01B2203/1258 (EP);
C10G2300/1025 (EP);
C10G2400/20 (EP);
Y02P20/52 (EP);
Y02P20/584 (EP);
Y02P30/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | C07C1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/43] |
Former [2010/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIREKTEN SYNTHESE LEICHTER KOHLENWASSERSTOFFE AUS ERDGAS | [2010/25] | English: | METHOD OF DIRECT SYNTHESIS OF LIGHT HYDROCARBONS FROM NATURAL GAS | [2010/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE DIRECTE D'HYDROCARBURES LÉGERS À PARTIR DE GAZ NATUREL | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2009 | Translation filed | 24.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 19.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2008 | AT | 24.10.2018 | CY | 24.10.2018 | CZ | 24.10.2018 | DK | 24.10.2018 | EE | 24.10.2018 | ES | 24.10.2018 | FI | 24.10.2018 | HR | 24.10.2018 | IT | 24.10.2018 | LT | 24.10.2018 | LV | 24.10.2018 | MC | 24.10.2018 | MT | 24.10.2018 | NL | 24.10.2018 | PL | 24.10.2018 | RO | 24.10.2018 | SE | 24.10.2018 | SI | 24.10.2018 | SK | 24.10.2018 | TR | 24.10.2018 | BG | 24.01.2019 | NO | 24.01.2019 | GR | 25.01.2019 | IS | 24.02.2019 | PT | 24.02.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 22.09.2008 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 24.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]KR20040051953 (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [IY]WO0160773 (SYNTROLEUM CORP [US], et al) [I] 1 * figure 1 * * abstract * * page 3, lines 14-25 * * page 8, line 5 - page 13, line 12 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]US4340503 (RAO V UDAYA S, et al) [Y] 1,5-8 * column 1, lines 41-46 * * column 2, lines 43-53, * * column 3, lines 33-39,49-55,58-61 * * column 4, lines 1-3.14-16,19-26 * * table 1 *; | [A]WO9205869 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1 * example 7 *; | [Y]WO9857743 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1,5-10 * page 1, lines 12-15 * * page 2, lines 2-3,16-25 * * page 3, lines 12-14 * * page 4, lines 5-6 * * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 6 * * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 4 * * page 10, lines 18-22 * * claim 14 *; | [Y]US4622308 (KOIKEDA MINORU [JP], et al) [Y] 1,9,10 * column 5, lines 5-10 * * column 6, lines 18-19 * * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 2 * * column 8, lines 41-44,62-67 * * column 8, line 68 - column 9, line 21 *; | [Y] - Chong Wang ET AL, "Review of Directly Producing Light Olefins via CO Hydrogenation", Journal of Natural Gas Chemistry, (20030101), pages 10 - 16, URL: http://www.bjb.dicp.ac.cn/jngc/2003/03-01/020902.pdf, (20140410), XP055113521 [Y] 1 * abstract * * "Making olefins [...] via F-T synthesis"; page 10, column right * * "However, iron [...] other metal catalysts".; page 12, column left - column right * * "The choice [...] been investigated"; page 13, column left, paragraph 4.2 Effect of the support * * "Metal interactions [...] was obtained".; page 14, column left * * table 3 * * "It is well known [...] CO hydrogenation"; page 14, column right, paragraph 4.3 Effect of the promoter * * "Potassium is a well known [...] as a consequence"; page 15, column left * | [YA] - MULPURI JANARDANARAO, "Direct Catalytic Conversion of Synthesis Gas to Lower Olefins", INDUSTRIAL & ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19900901), vol. 29, no. 9, doi:10.1021/IE00105A001, ISSN 0888-5885, pages 1735 - 1753, XP002628374 [Y] 1,5-8 * "There has been renewed [...] directly from synthesis gas"; page 1735, column left * * "Both fixed bed [...] are in operation"; page 1736, column left * * "The formation of olefins [...] ratio of the synthesis gas"; page 1737, column left * * "In general the presence [...] olefin/paraffin ratio in the hydrocarbons produced"; page 1737, column right * * table IV * * "When copper and alkali contents [...] molecular weight hydrocarbons"; page 1739, column left * * "Of the several [...] ZSM-5 zeolites are the most promising"; page 1742, column right * * "There is currently [...] important influence on selectivity"; page 1744, column right, paragraphs Zeolite-based catalysts * * "Zeolite-based iron catalysts [...] zeolite-based catalysts"; page 1745, column left * * "The catalyst consisting [...] than do copper-based systems"; page 1745, column left * * "Suspended-phase FT synthesis [...] are included in Table IV"; page 1745, column right * * "The major problem [...] by using zeolite-based catalysts"; page 1747, column right * [A] 9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie00105a001 | [Y] - C N Satterfield ET AL, "Fischer-Tropsch Synthesis in a Slurry Reactor: Preclpitated Iron-Copper-Potassium Catalyst", Ind. fng. Chem. Process Des. Dev., (19840101), pages 849 - 851, URL: http://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/i200027a038, (20140410), XP055113569 [Y] 1-7 * 100Fe:22Cu:1K2CO3; page 849, column left * * "In general [...] reduce the O/P ratio"; page 850, column left * * table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/i200027a038 | [L] - SUK-HWAN KANG ET AL, "Fischerâ Tropsch Synthesis Using Zeolite-supported Iron Catalysts for the Production of Light Hydrocarbons", CATALYSIS LETTERS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20080725), vol. 125, no. 3-4, doi:10.1007/S10562-008-9586-2, ISSN 1572-879X, pages 264 - 270, XP019640287 [L] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10562-008-9586-2 | [A] - WANG Y N ET AL, "Kinetics modelling of Fischer-Tropsch synthesis over an industrial Fe-Cu-K catalyst", FUEL, IPC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY PRESS, GUILDFORD, GB, vol. 82, no. 2, ISSN 0016-2361, (20030101), pages 195 - 213, (20030101), XP027114676 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [T] - HIRSA M. TORRES GALVIS ET AL, "Catalysts for Production of Lower Olefins from Synthesis Gas: A Review", ACS CATALYSIS, (20130906), vol. 3, no. 9, doi:10.1021/cs4003436, ISSN 2155-5435, pages 2130 - 2149, XP055113505 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cs4003436 | International search | [A]US6225359 (O'REAR DENNIS JOHN [US], et al); | [A]WO0160773 (SYNTROLEUM CORP [US], et al); | [A]KR100482646B (RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY) | [A] - YI-NING WANG ET AL., "Kinetics modelling of Fischer-Tropsch synthesis over an industrial Fe- Cu-K catalyst", FUEL, (2003), vol. 82, pages 195 - 213, XP004385994 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-2361(02)00154-0 | by applicant | KR20040051953 | WO0160773 | US4340503 | WO9205869 | WO9857743 | US4622308 | - C. N. SATTERFIELD et al., "Fischer-Tropsch synthesis in a slurry reactor using a precipitated iron-copper-potassium catalyst", Ind. Eng. Chem. Process Des. Dev., (19840000), pages 849 - 851 | - "Direct Catalytic Conversion of Synthesis Gas to Lower Olefins", Industrial & Engineering Chemistry Research, American Chemical Society, vol. 29, pages 1735 - 1753 | - CHONG WANG et al., "Review of Directly Producing Light Olefins via CO Hydrogenation", the Journal of Natural Gas Chemistry, (20030000), pages 10 - 16, XP055113521 | - "Fischer-Tropsch synthesis using zeolite-supported iron catalysts for the production of light hydrocarbons", SUK-HWAN KANG et al., Catalysis Letters, Kluwer Academic Publishers, (20080000), vol. 125, pages 264 - 270 |