EP2204428 - HEAT-EXPANDABLE MICROSPHERES, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/27] | HEAT-EXPANDABLE MICROSPHERES, PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF THE SAME AND USES THEREOF | ||
[2016/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matsumoto Yushi-Seiyaku CO., LTD. 1-3, Shibukawa-cho 2-chome Yao-shi, Osaka 581-0075 / JP | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOHARA, Takeshi c/o Matsumoto Yushi-Seiyaku Co. Ltd. 1-3 Shibukawa-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0075 / JP | 02 /
SHIRAKABE, Yoshiaki c/o Matsumoto Yushi-Seiyaku Co. Ltd. 1-3 Shibukawa-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0075 / JP | 03 /
YOSEJIMA, Ikuo c/o Matsumoto Yushi-Seiyaku Co. Ltd. 1-3 Shibukawa-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0075 / JP | 04 /
KITANO, Kenichi c/o Matsumoto Yushi-Seiyaku Co. Ltd. 1-3 Shibukawa-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0075 / JP | 05 /
MASUDA, Toshiaki c/o Matsumoto Yushi-Seiyaku Co. Ltd. 1-3 Shibukawa-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0075 / JP | [2017/09] |
Former [2010/27] | 01 /
INOHARA, Takeshi c/o Matsumoto Yushi-Seiyaku Co. Ltd. 1-3 Shibukawa-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0075 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIRAKABE, Yoshiaki c/o Matsumoto Yushi-Seiyaku Co. Ltd. 1-3 Shibukawa-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0075 / JP | |||
03 /
YOSEJIMA, Ikuo c/o Matsumoto Yushi-Seiyaku Co. Ltd. 1-3 Shibukawa-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0075 / JP | |||
04 /
KITANO, Kenichi c/o Matsumoto Yushi-Seiyaku Co. Ltd. 1-3 Shibukawa-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0075 / JP | |||
05 /
MASUDA, Toshiaki c/o Matsumoto Yushi-Seiyaku Co. Ltd. 1-3 Shibukawa-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka 581-0075 / JP | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2017/09] |
Former [2010/27] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08838920.0 | 09.10.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008JP02847 | Priority number, date | JP20070268476 | 16.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007268476 | [2010/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009050863 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2204428 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2204428 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/00, B01J13/18 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
B01J13/14 (EP,US);
B01J13/18 (EP,US);
B01J13/20 (EP,US);
C08J9/32 (EP,US);
C08J2203/22 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/27] | C09K3/00, B01J13/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2010/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WÄRMEDEHNBARE MIKROKUGELN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2010/27] | English: | HEAT-EXPANDABLE MICROSPHERES, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2016/51] | French: | MICROSPHÈRES THERMOEXPANSIBLES, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2010/27] |
Former [2010/27] | HEAT-EXPANDABLE MICROSPHERES, PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF THE SAME AND USES THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2010 | Translation filed | 12.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 22.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2008 | AT | 01.03.2017 | CY | 01.03.2017 | CZ | 01.03.2017 | DK | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | ES | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | IT | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | NL | 01.03.2017 | PL | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | TR | 01.03.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | NO | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | PT | 03.07.2017 | GB | 09.10.2017 | IE | 09.10.2017 | LU | 09.10.2017 | MT | 09.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | FR | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.10.2008 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 09.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.10.2017 | ||
LU | 09.10.2017 | ||
MT | 09.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.10.2008 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 09.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.10.2017 | ||
LU | 09.10.2017 | ||
MT | 09.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 09.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.10.2017 | ||
LU | 09.10.2017 | ||
MT | 09.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 09.10.2017 | ||
LU | 09.10.2017 | ||
MT | 09.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 09.10.2017 | ||
LU | 09.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 09.10.2017 | ||
LU | 09.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
GB | 09.10.2017 | ||
LU | 09.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0569234 (MATSUMOTO YUSHI SEIYAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1,6,14-16 * Claims: 1,2,7; Examples: 1-4; Columns: 2, l10-13, l47-57; 3, l20-23; 4, l4-8. * [I] 2-5,7,8; | [A]WO0037547 (ZMS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-8,14-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2001044477 (SOANE DAVID S [US], et al) [A] 1-8,14-16 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004210982 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2007072769 (KUREHA CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007131688 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [A]WO2007046273 (MATSUMOTO YUSHI SEIYAKU KK [JP], et al); | [A]WO2006030946 (KUREHA CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2004105858 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2003001098 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2002511900 (GORE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC.); | [A]JPH05329360 (MATSUMOTO YUSHI SEIYAKU KK); | [A]JPS56143229 (KANEBO NSC KK) | by applicant | JP4226524B | US3615972 | WO9943758 | JP2006213930 | JP2006096963 | JPS62201231 |