EP2203412 - MONOACYLGLYCEROL LIPASE INHIBITORS FOR MODULATION OF CANNABINOID ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY 360 Huntington Avenue Boston, MA 02115-5000 / US | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKRIYANNIS, Alexandros 16 Stearns Road Watertown MA 02472 / US | 02 /
NIKAS, Spyridon, P. 4 Dolores Avenue Apt. 12 Waltham, MA 02452 / US | 03 /
ALAPAFUJA, Shakiru, O. 47 Homer Avenue Apt. 5-3 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 04 /
SHUKLA, Vidyanand, G. 105 West 4th Street Apt. 4A South Boston, MA 02127 / US | [2010/46] |
Former [2010/27] | 01 /
MAKRIYANNIS, Alexandros 16 Stearns Road Watertown MA 02472 / US | ||
02 /
NIKAS, Spyridon, P. 5 Dolores Avenue Waltham MA 02452 / US | |||
03 /
ALAPAFUJA, Shakiru, O. 132 S. Common Street Apt. 105 Lynn MA 01962 / US | |||
04 /
SHUKLA, Vidyanand, G. 5 Dolores Avenue Waltham MA 02452 / US | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2010/27] | Grund, Martin, et al GRUND Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08840122.9 | 16.10.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008US80214 | Priority number, date | US20070999127P | 16.10.2007 Original published format: US 999127 P | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009052319 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203412 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07C309/82, C07C323/43, C07C37/50, C07C271/28, C07D211/16, A61K31/00, C07C37/62 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
C07C271/28 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C271/38 (EP,US);
C07C309/82 (EP,US);
C07C323/43 (EP,US);
C07C37/055 (EP,US);
C07C37/62 (EP,US);
C07C45/41 (EP,US);
C07C45/44 (EP,US);
C07C45/45 (EP,US);
C07C45/673 (EP,US);
C07C45/68 (EP,US);
C07C49/255 (EP,US);
C07C49/84 (EP,US);
C07D211/16 (EP,US);
C07D213/61 (EP,US);
C07D271/10 (EP,US);
C07D275/03 (EP,US);
C07D275/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C37/055, C07C39/11 (US,EP);
C07C37/055, C07C39/24 (EP,US);
C07C37/62, C07C39/24 (EP,US);
C07C45/41, C07C47/277 (US,EP);
C07C45/44, C07C47/575 (US,EP);
C07C45/45, C07C49/233 (US,EP);
C07C45/45, C07C49/255 (US,EP);
C07C45/673, C07C49/83 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2010/27] | C07C231/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | MONOACYLGLYCEROLLIPASEHEMMER ZUR MODULATION DER CANNABINOIDAKTIVITÄT | [2010/27] | English: | MONOACYLGLYCEROL LIPASE INHIBITORS FOR MODULATION OF CANNABINOID ACTIVITY | [2010/27] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE LA MONOACYLGLYCÉROL LIPASE DE MODULATION DE L'ACTIVITÉ CANNABINOÏDE | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 17.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2008013963 (UNIV CONNECTICUT [US], et al) [XP] 1-11 * page 43; claim -; compound 18 *; | [XI] - DAVID A KARANIAN ET AL, "Dual Modulation of Endocannabinoid Transport and Fatty Acid Amide Hydrolase Protects against Excitotoxicity", JOURNAL OF THE HISTORY OF THE NEUROSCIENCES, SWETS AND ZEITLINGER, LISSE, NL, (20050824), vol. 25, no. 34, doi:10.1523/JNEUROSCI.2347-05.2005, ISSN 0964-704X, pages 7813 - 7820, XP008103385 [X] 1-10 * page 1195, column L, paragraph 2 * [I] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.2347-05.2005 | [XI] - M STEFFENS ET AL, "Cannabinoid CB 1 receptor-mediated modulation of evoked dopamine release and of adenylyl cyclase activity in the human neocortex", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (20040401), vol. 141, no. 7, doi:10.1038/sj.bjp.0705706, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 1193 - 1203, XP055003419 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * [I] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0705706 | International search | [X]WO2006116773 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [X]WO2006044617 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al); | [X]WO9013549 (STERLING DRUG INC [US]); | [X]WO9745407 (UNIV CONNECTICUT [US]); | [Y]US7109216 (KRUSE CORNELIS G [NL], et al); | [Y]WO2007046550 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al); | [Y] - KOUTEK ET AL., "Inhibitors of Arachidonoyl Ethanolamide Hydrolysis", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19940916), vol. 269, no. 37, page 22938, XP008132715 |