Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
25.03.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.12.2014 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
17.10.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.08.2014 | First examination report | |
20.08.2014 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
16.10.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.10.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.10.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
24.12.2010 | Change - extension states | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] |
19.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.09.2010 | Supplementary search report | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
03.09.2010 | Change - classification | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
25.06.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
25.06.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
10.06.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.05.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant | |
13.05.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.04.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication |