Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010273162 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98072207 | 17.10.2007 | WO2008US79924 | 15.10.2008 | US67661308 | 15.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2209905 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2010 | A4 | EP2209905 | 28.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98072207 | 17.10.2007 | WO2008US79924 | 15.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0816526 | 24.03.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US98072207 | 17.10.2007 | WO2008US79924 | 15.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101827945 | 08.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US98072207 | 17.10.2007 | WO2008US79924 | 15.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009052137 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98072207 | 17.10.2007 |