|
08.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.06.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
28.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.06.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
19.06.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
02.03.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Claims filed under Art.19 PCT |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2010 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.02.2010 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.02.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
16.02.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
16.02.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.02.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.02.2010 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.01.2010 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.01.2010 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.01.2010 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.12.2009 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.07.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
27 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |