23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
10.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
08.05.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
14.06.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] |
10.06.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.06.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.06.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
11.02.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
07.12.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] |
30.11.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.07.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.06.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.04.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.10.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.06.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.12.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
28.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
28.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.09.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.04.2013 |
First examination report |
|
24.04.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.03.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
16.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.12.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] |
19.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.07.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
02.07.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
15.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.05.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|