EP2208329 - VOICE AND DATA COMMUNICATION SERVICES USING ORTHOGONAL SUB-CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2013/15] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS, INC. 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHITRAPU, Prabhakar, R. 135 Brochant Drive Blue Bell, PA 19422 / US | 02 /
AGHILI, Behrouz 32 Bethal Lane Commack, NY 1725 / US | 03 /
RUDOLF, Marian 525 Lucien L'Allier App 204 Montreal, Québec H3C 4L3 / CA | 04 /
DICK, Stephen, G. 61 Bobann Drive Nesconset, NY 11767 / US | [2012/12] |
Former [2010/29] | 01 /
CHITRAPU, Prabhakar, R. 135 Brochant Drive Blue Bell PA 19422 / US | ||
02 /
AGHILI, Behrouz 32 Bethal Lane Commack, NY 1725 / US | |||
03 /
RUDOLF, Marian 525 Lucien L'Allier App 204 Montreal, Québec H3C 4L3 / CA | |||
04 /
DICK, Stephen, G. 61 Bobann Drive Nesconset NY 11767 / US | Representative(s) | Badel, Xavier Claude Yves, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [2012/31] |
Former [2011/36] | Badel, Xavier Claude Yves, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/29] | Bratt, Jan Henrik Awapatent AB Drottninggatan 89 10430 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 08841485.9 | 24.10.2008 | [2010/29] | WO2008US81051 | Priority number, date | US20070982167P | 24.10.2007 Original published format: US 982167 P | US20080097670 | 17.09.2008 Original published format: US 97670 | [2010/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009055636 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2208329 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2208329 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/34, H04L5/12, H04W72/04 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
H04L27/3483 (EP,US);
H04L5/12 (EP,US);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/29] | H04L27/34, H04L5/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/29] | Title | German: | ORTHOGONALE SUBKANÄLE VERWENDENDE SPRACH- UND DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSDIENSTE | [2010/29] | English: | VOICE AND DATA COMMUNICATION SERVICES USING ORTHOGONAL SUB-CHANNELS | [2010/29] | French: | SERVICES DE COMMUNICATION VOCALE ET DE DONNÉES UTILISANT DES SOUS-CANAUX ORTHOGONAUX | [2010/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 02.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12173477.6 / EP2506517 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2008 | AT | 01.08.2012 | BE | 01.08.2012 | CY | 01.08.2012 | CZ | 01.08.2012 | DK | 01.08.2012 | EE | 01.08.2012 | FI | 01.08.2012 | HR | 01.08.2012 | IT | 01.08.2012 | LT | 01.08.2012 | LV | 01.08.2012 | MT | 01.08.2012 | NL | 01.08.2012 | PL | 01.08.2012 | RO | 01.08.2012 | SE | 01.08.2012 | SI | 01.08.2012 | SK | 01.08.2012 | TR | 01.08.2012 | IE | 24.10.2012 | LU | 24.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 01.11.2012 | NO | 01.11.2012 | GR | 02.11.2012 | ES | 12.11.2012 | IS | 01.12.2012 | PT | 03.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
TR | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 24.10.2012 | ||
LU | 24.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
TR | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
IE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 01.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9826625 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005185733 (TOLLI ANTTI [FI], et al) [X] 12,13 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0057] *; | [X]WO2005117379 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 12-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 12 - line 28 *; | [E]WO2009036389 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [E] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0150] ** paragraph [0202] - paragraph [0210] *; | [X] - NOKIA, "Voice capacity evolution with orthogonal sub channel", 3GPP TSG GERAN #33, SEOUL, SOUTH KOREA, (20070212), vol. GP-070214, no. 33, pages 1 - 8, XP002512159 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | [X] - WENWU MENG ET AL, "Sub-carrier assignment for multimedia traffic over OFDM wireless channel", 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, NETWORKING AND MOBILE COMPUTING (IEEE CAT. NO.06EX1481C) IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (2006), ISBN 1-4244-0517-3, pages 1 - 4, XP002531367 [X] 12,13 * abstract * * figure 1 * |