EP2216047 - REGULATOR FOR SIGNALING OF TOLL-LIKE RECEPTOR, WHICH COMPRISES CATHEPSIN INHIBITOR AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Velcura Therapeutics, Inc. 570 High St. Northville, MI 48167 / US | [2012/11] |
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states Nippon Chemiphar Co., Ltd. 2-3, Iwamoto-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1010032 / JP | ||
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states National University Corporation Tokyo Medical and Dental University 1-5-45 Yushima Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8510 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Chemiphar Co., Ltd. 2-3, Iwamoto-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1010032 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAYANAGI, Hiroshi 36-8 Kamiyama-cho Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0047 / JP | 02 /
ASAGIRI, Masataka 9500 Gilman Dr. MC 0375 NSB3318 La Jolla, California 9209-30375 / US | 03 /
HIRAI, Toshitake 15-4 Nakanodaikashima-cho Noda-shi Chiba 278-0036 / JP | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08841616.9 | 23.10.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008JP69235 | Priority number, date | JP20070276937 | 24.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007276937 | [2010/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009054454 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2216047 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61K31/336, A61P1/04, A61P11/06, A61P13/12, A61P17/06, A61P19/00, A61P25/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P37/02, A61P37/06, A61P37/08, A61P43/00, C07D303/48, A61K31/427, A61K31/495, A61K31/55 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
C07D303/48 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/336 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/32] | A61K45/00, A61K31/336, A61P1/04, A61P11/06, A61P13/12, A61P17/06, A61P19/00, A61P25/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P37/02, A61P37/06, A61P37/08, A61P43/00, C07D303/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Extension states | AL | 25.05.2010 | BA | 25.05.2010 | MK | 25.05.2010 | RS | 25.05.2010 | Title | German: | REGULATOR ZUR SIGNALISIERUNG DES TOLL-LIKE-REZEPTORS MIT EINEM CATHEPSIN-INHIBITOR ALS WIRKSTOFF | [2010/32] | English: | REGULATOR FOR SIGNALING OF TOLL-LIKE RECEPTOR, WHICH COMPRISES CATHEPSIN INHIBITOR AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2010/32] | French: | RÉGULATEUR POUR LA SIGNALISATION DU RÉCEPTEUR TOLL-LIKE, COMPORTANT UN INHIBITEUR DE LA CATHEPSINE COMME PRINCIPE ACTIF | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2010 | Translation filed | 25.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 30.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/01] | 09.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0158886 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12 * claims 4, 7 * * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1 *; | [X]WO2005014006 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12 * claims 1, 4, 6, 7 *; | [X]EP1022276 (NIPPON CHEMIPHAR CO [JP]) [X] 1 * claims 1-12 *; | [X]JPH06336428 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, et al) [X] 1 * claims 1-7 *; | [X]WO0055124 (AXYS PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * claim 1 * * page 21, lines 8-26 *; | [X]US2001008901 (GABRIEL TOBIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0042]; claim 1 *; | [X]WO02100849 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1, 22, 24 *; | [X]WO9740066 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1, 2, 3 *; | [X]WO2004017911 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO0189451 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2006109045 (UNIV BELFAST [GB], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X] - OLGA VASILJEVA ET AL, "Emerging Roles of Cysteine Cathepsins in Disease and their Potential as Drug Targets", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL DESIGN, (20070201), vol. 13, no. 4, doi:10.2174/138161207780162962, ISSN 1381-6128, pages 387 - 403, XP055012551 [X] 1-12 * page 396, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 397, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/138161207780162962 | [X] - TSUKUBA T ET AL, "Cathepsin E-deficient mice show increased susceptibility to bacterialinfection associated with the decreased expression of multiple cellsurface Toll-like receptors", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, JAPANESE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY / OUP, TOKYO; JP, (20060101), vol. 140, no. 1, doi:10.1093/JH/MVJ132, ISSN 0021-924X, pages 57 - 66, XP008135678 [X] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/JH/MVJ132 | [XP] - MASATAKA ASAGIRI ET AL, "Cathepsin K-Dependent Toll- Like Receptor 9 Signaling Revealed inExperimental Arthritis", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20080201), vol. 319, no. 5863, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1150110, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 624 - 627, XP008135679 [XP] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1150110 | International search | [X]JPH06336428 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD, et al); | [X]WO9911640 (NIPPON CHEMIPHAR CO [JP], et al); | [X]JP2000509376 ; | [X]JP2002539190 ; | [X]JP2003519125 ; | [X]JP2004526662 ; | [X]JP2005501017 ; | [X]JP2006505526 ; | [X]JP2006519768 ; | [X]WO2006109045 (UNIV BELFAST [GB], et al); | by applicant | WO9630354 | WO9721694 | WO9847887 | WO9911640 | JPH11263783 | JP2000186046 | WO0149288 | WO0158886 | WO0170232 | WO03053331 | WO03075836 | WO03091202 | JP2004517918 | WO2004108661 | WO2005000800 | WO2005066180 | JP2006514004 | JP2006520781 | WO2007025774 | JP2007511593 | JP2007524615 |