EP2220278 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROL OF YARN FEED IN A TUFTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Card-Monroe Corporation 4936 Adams Road Chattanooga Tennessee 37343 / US | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTMAN, William, M. 1910 Crystal Lake Lane Hixson, TN 37343 / US | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/34] | 01 /
CHRISTMAN, William, M. 5600 Lake Resort Terrace Chattanooga, TN 37415 / US | Representative(s) | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/34] | Hofstetter, Alfons J. Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08841794.4 | 23.10.2008 | [2010/34] | WO2008US80946 | Priority number, date | US20070981994P | 23.10.2007 Original published format: US 981994 P | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009055560 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2220278 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2220278 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D05C15/18, D05C15/34 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
D05C15/18 (EP,US);
D05C15/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR FADENFÜHRUNG BEI EINER TUFTINGMASCHINE | [2010/34] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROL OF YARN FEED IN A TUFTING MACHINE | [2010/34] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE CONTRÔLER L'ALIMENTATION EN FIL D'UNE MACHINE À TOUFFETER | [2010/34] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/34] | 05.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2012
16.05.2013
WITHDRAWN COBBLE BLACKBURN LIMITED Gate Street Blackburn BB1 3AH / GB Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2012
16.05.2013
WITHDRAWN COBBLE BLACKBURN LIMITED Gate Street Blackburn BB1 3AH / GB Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2012
16.05.2013
WITHDRAWN COBBLE BLACKBURN LIMITED Gate Street Blackburn BB1 3AH / GB Opponent's representative Draper, Martyn John Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.01.2012
COBBLE BLACKBURN LIMITED Gate Street Blackburn BB1 3AH / GB Opponent's representative Draper, Martyn John Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | 05.03.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.07.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 15.09.2013 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2011 | BE | 27.04.2011 | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | HR | 27.04.2011 | HU | 27.04.2011 | IT | 27.04.2011 | LT | 27.04.2011 | LV | 27.04.2011 | MT | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | PL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | NO | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | IS | 27.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | IE | 23.10.2011 | LU | 23.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | FR | 02.11.2011 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | [2018/17] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
HU | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
IE | 23.10.2011 | ||
LU | 23.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
IE | 23.10.2011 | ||
LU | 23.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
IE | 23.10.2011 | ||
LU | 23.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
IE | 23.10.2011 | ||
LU | 23.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4867080 (TAYLOR BROOKS E [US], et al) [X] 1-14* column 3, line 18 - column 7, line 32; figures 1-11 *; | [X]US5005498 (TAYLOR BROOKS E [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 3, line 22 - column 7, line 36; figures 1-11 *; | [X]WO9612843 (BURLINGTON INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 6, paragraph 6 - page 13, paragraph 3; figures 1-5 *; | [X]GB2319786 (TUFTCO CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 34, paragraph 2; figures 1-14 *; | [X]US2002037388 (MORGANTE MICHAEL R [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-8 *; | [X]US6550407 (FROST STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 3, line 47 - column 8, line 21; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US2003164130 (MORGANTE MICHAEL R [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0112]; figures 1-22 *; | [X]US2004025767 (CARD ROY T [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]GB2392172 (TUFTCO CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-11 *; | [X]WO2004057084 (CARD MONROE CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 8, line 5 - page 36, line 11; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US6807917 (CHRISTMAN WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 4, line 13 - column 16, line 63; figures 1-8 *; | [X]US2005056197 (CARD ROY T [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US2005204975 (CARD ROY T [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0072]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US2006272564 (CARD ROY T [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0074]; figures 1-10 * |