EP2201297 - DEVICE FOR HUMIDIFYING AND HEATING A COMBUSTIBLE GAS TO BE REFORMED FOR A FUEL CELL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states MTU Friedrichshafen GmbH Maybachplatz 1 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states MTU Onsite Energy GmbH Christa-McAuliffe-Strasse 1 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Johann Hofener Strasse 20 85464 Finsing / DE | 02 /
RECKELS, Udo Hebbelstraße 6 41464 Neuss / DE | 03 /
RUSS, Michael Waldstrasse 12 93342 Saal an der Donau / DE | [2010/31] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
HUBER, Johann Hofener Strasse 20 85464 Finsing / DE | ||
02 /
RECKELS, Udo Maximilian-Kolbe-Allee 8 81739 München / DE | |||
03 /
RUSS, Michael Waldstrasse 12 93342 Saal an der Donau / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/14] |
Former [2010/26] | Winter, Josef Tognum AG VL-P Schutzrechte Maybachplatz 1 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08841997.3 | 22.10.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008EP08911 | Priority number, date | DE20071050799 | 24.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007050799 | [2010/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009053034 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2201297 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F23K5/00, C01B3/32, F28C3/08, F28F9/22 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
F23K5/007 (EP,US);
C01B3/32 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/066 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0811 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1258 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1288 (EP,US);
F23K2400/10 (EP,US);
F28C3/08 (EP,US);
F28D7/1607 (EP,US);
F28F9/22 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/26] | F23K5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR BEFEUCHTUNG UND ERHITZUNG EINES ZU REFORMIERENDEN BRENNGASES FÜR EINE BRENNSTOFFZELLENANLAGE | [2010/26] | English: | DEVICE FOR HUMIDIFYING AND HEATING A COMBUSTIBLE GAS TO BE REFORMED FOR A FUEL CELL UNIT | [2010/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR MOUILLER ET CHAUFFER UN GAZ COMBUSTIBLE À REFORMER, POUR UNE INSTALLATION À PILES À COMBUSTIBLE | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 14.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/45] | 22.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1196833 (NIRO ATOMIZER AS) [A] 1,5-14 * page 2, column 2, line 5 - page 3, column 1, line 21; figure 1 *; | [XYI]JPH0640701 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-2,15 * abstract * [Y] 16 [I] 3-4; | [XI]JPH0640702 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-2,15 * abstract *[I] 3-4; | [YA]DE19716470 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 16 * column 4, line 20 - line 40; figure 1 * [A] 1,5-15; | [AD]EP1536185 (SUMITOMO PREC PRODUCTS COMPANY [JP]) [AD] 1,15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] *; | [A]DE102004012607 (KLOECKNER HAENSEL PROC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5-15 * paragraphs [0035] , [0036]; figure 1 * |