Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010251603 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98276707 | 26.10.2007 | WO2008US80858 | 23.10.2008 | US68189608 | 23.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2217686 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98276707 | 26.10.2007 | WO2008US80858 | 23.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2703961 | 30.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98276707 | 26.10.2007 | WO2008US80858 | 23.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009055518 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98276707 | 26.10.2007 |