EP2197568 - PURIFICATION STRUCTURE INCORPORATING A BIASED ELECTROCHEMICAL CATALYST SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN CENTRE DE RECHERCHES ET D'ETUDES EUROPEEN 18, Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Centre de Recherches et D'Etudes Europeen SAS 18 Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERNOUX, Philippe 761 route de la Nation F-69270 Rochetaillee sur Saone / FR | 02 /
HADJAR, Abdelkader 16 boulevard Jean XXIII F-69008 Lyon / FR | 03 /
MAROUF, Ahmed 63 avenue Prosper Mérimée Appartement 57 F-84300 Cavaillon / FR | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Francois Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc B.P. 135 93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Lucas, Francois SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE Département Propriété Industrielle 39, Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 08842824.8 | 02.10.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008FR51790 | Priority number, date | FR20070058153 | 08.10.2007 Original published format: FR 0758153 | [2010/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009053589 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2197568 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2197568 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
B01D53/944 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1025 (EP,US);
B01D2255/104 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20746 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20753 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSSTRUKTUR MIT EINEM VORGESPANNTEN ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN KATALYSATORSYSTEM | [2010/25] | English: | PURIFICATION STRUCTURE INCORPORATING A BIASED ELECTROCHEMICAL CATALYST SYSTEM | [2010/25] | French: | STRUCTURE DE PURIFICATION INCORPORANT UN SYSTEME DE CATALYSE ELECTROCHIMIQUE POLARISE | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 01.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/not-exclusive | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Licencee: | Saint-Gobain Industriekeramik Roedental GmbH Oeslauer Strasse 35 96472 Roedental / DE | Date: | 18.04.2011 | [2011/23] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.2011 | CY | 20.07.2011 | CZ | 20.07.2011 | DK | 20.07.2011 | EE | 20.07.2011 | FI | 20.07.2011 | HR | 20.07.2011 | HU | 20.07.2011 | IE | 20.07.2011 | LT | 20.07.2011 | LV | 20.07.2011 | MT | 20.07.2011 | NL | 20.07.2011 | PL | 20.07.2011 | RO | 20.07.2011 | SE | 20.07.2011 | SI | 20.07.2011 | SK | 20.07.2011 | TR | 20.07.2011 | LU | 02.10.2011 | BG | 20.10.2011 | NO | 20.10.2011 | GR | 21.10.2011 | BE | 31.10.2011 | ES | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | IS | 20.11.2011 | PT | 21.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
TR | 20.07.2011 | ||
LU | 02.10.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
LU | 02.10.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
LU | 02.10.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
MT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
HR | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LV | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001145820 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1* abstract *; | [AD]US6878354 (MITSUDA KENRO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-15 * figure 1; example 1; claim 1 *; | [PA]FR2899493 (SAINT GOBAIN CT RECHERCHES [FR]) [PA] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * |