EP2214026 - SAMPLE DETECTOR AND MEASUREMENT DEVICE EQUIPPED WITH THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [2015/33] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKIMOTO, Shinjiro c/o Arkray Inc 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/31] | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08842887.5 | 25.10.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008JP69380 | Priority number, date | JP20070278829 | 26.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007278829 | [2010/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009054516 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2214026 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/02, G01N21/77, G01N33/52, G01V8/12 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
G01N35/00613 (EP,US);
G01N21/8483 (EP,US);
G01N35/00663 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | PROBENDETEKTOR UND DAMIT AUSGESTATTETE MESSVORRICHTUNG | [2010/31] | English: | SAMPLE DETECTOR AND MEASUREMENT DEVICE EQUIPPED WITH THE SAME | [2010/31] | French: | DÉTECTEUR D'ÉCHANTILLONS ET DISPOSITIF EN ÉTANT ÉQUIPÉ | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2010 | Translation filed | 25.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 29.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/36] | 28.07.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2020 | 28.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5889585 (MARKART ERNST [DE]) [AD] 1-11 * figures 1-3,6 * * column 1, line 50 - line 63 ** column 2, line 43 - line 62 *; | [XI]US6055060 (BOLDUAN FRANZ [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * figures 1,3-5,6a,6b,12 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 6 * * column 6, line 22 - line 37 * * column 7, line 26 - line 45 * * column 8, line 56 - column 9, line 11 * * column 10, line 32 - line 34 * * column 11, line 4 - line 13 * [I] 4,7,8,11; | [XI]US6707554 (MILTNER KARL [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,6,9-11 * figures 4-6 * * column 3, line 7 - line 10 * * column 3, line 34 - line 36 * * column 3, line 56 - line 64 * * column 4, line 50 - line 55 * * column 9, line 27 - line 32 * [I] 2,7,8; | [A]WO2007007849 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 10 * figures 6,17 * * paragraphs [0080] , [0082] , [0084] *; | [E]EP2031373 (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [E] 1,2,5-9 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraphs [0044] , [0055] , [0078] * | International search | [Y]JP2002525625 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH.); | [A]JP2006162496 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2006208386 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC); | [Y]WO2007007849 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) | Examination | EP1843147 | by applicant | US5889585 | JP3455654B | JP2004163393 |