04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
16.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
07.03.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
03.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] |
06.12.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
15.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
29.03.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] |
22.03.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.03.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.12.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.11.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
30.11.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
16.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
19.10.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.08.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2011 |
First examination report |
|
04.04.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.12.2010 |
Change - German title |
published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] |
31.12.2010 |
Change - English title |
published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] |
31.12.2010 |
Change - French title |
published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] |
03.11.2010 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
02.11.2010 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
02.11.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
26.10.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.06.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] |
04.06.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] |
03.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|