EP2203240 - MULTI-STAGE CO2 REMOVAL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING A FLUE GAS STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASLO, Dennis, J. 1536 Staffwood Road Knoxville Tennessee 37922 / US | 02 /
GAL, Eli 10245 Parkwood Drive 8 Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
BADE, Otto, M. Gamle Drammensvei 18A 1369 Stabekk / NO | 04 /
KOZAK, Frederic, Z. 830 Meadowfield Drive Knoxville, Tennessee 37923 / US | 05 /
MURASKIN, David, J. 12032 Butternut Lane Knoxville, Tennessee 37922 / US | 06 /
DOPATKA, Jurgen 1164 Oak Haven Road Knoxville, Tennessee 37932 / US | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Simonsson, Erik Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 20071 Malmö / SE | [2012/32] |
Former [2010/27] | Simonsson, Erik Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 20071 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 08843063.2 | 22.10.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008US80703 | Priority number, date | US20070981742P | 22.10.2007 Original published format: US 981742 P | US20080255104 | 21.10.2008 Original published format: US 255104 | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009055419 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203240 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2203240 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/50, B01D53/14, B01D53/62, B01D53/78 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
B01D53/50 (EP,US);
B01D53/1406 (EP,US);
B01D53/1475 (EP,US);
B01D53/62 (EP,US);
B01D53/78 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/27] | B01D53/14, B01D53/62, B01D53/78 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | MEHRSTUFIGES CO2-ENTFERNUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFBEREITUNG EINES RAUCHGASSTROMS | [2010/27] | English: | MULTI-STAGE CO2 REMOVAL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING A FLUE GAS STREAM | [2010/27] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉLIMINATION DE CO2 À PLUSIEURS ÉTAGES ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UN FLUX DE GAZ DE FUMÉE | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 09.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | HR | 08.08.2012 | LT | 08.08.2012 | LV | 08.08.2012 | MT | 08.08.2012 | SI | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | IE | 22.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | ES | 19.11.2012 | IS | 08.12.2012 | PT | 10.12.2012 | [2014/21] |
Former [2013/51] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 08.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE469840 (LINDE EISMASCH AG) [A] 1-33 * page 1, line 59 - page 2, line 70; figure 1 *; | [X]US1897725 (WILHELM GAUS, et al) [X] 1,14,27 * column 1, lines 1-27; figure 1 *; | [A]US2878099 (WILHELM BREUING, et al) [A] 1-33 * figure 1 * * column 2, lines 48-55 * * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 4 * * column 3, lines 22-42 *; | [A]US2889197 (FRIEDRICH BAUMANN) [A] 14 * columns 5,6,7; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0193677 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1* pages 2,3; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US4847057 (BRUGEROLLE JEAN-RENAUD [FR], et al) [X] 1,14,27 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, lines 30-37 * * column 3, lines 1-19 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 16 *; | [DX]WO2006022885 (GAL ELI [US]) [DX] 1-33 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] , [0051] , [0058] *; | [A] - FIGUEROA ET AL, "Advances in CO2 capture technology-The U.S. Department of Energy's Carbon Sequestration Program", 20080101, (20070917), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 9 - 20, XP022416521 [A] 1-33 * column 2.1.2.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matchar.2007.01.002 | [A] - YEH ET AL, "Semi-batch absorption and regeneration studies for CO2 capture by aqueous ammonia", FUEL PROCESSING TECHNOLOGY,, (20051001), vol. 86, no. 14-15, ISSN 0378-3820, pages 1533 - 1546, XP005000683 [A] 6,8,10,11,13,19,21,23,24,26,28-33 * paragraphs [04.2] , [04.3] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fuproc.2005.01.015 |