EP2201312 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COOLING USING TWO SEPARATE COOLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451-1449 / US | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Richard, M. Post Office Box 44 Prosper TX 75078-0044 / US | 02 /
WYATT, William, G. 7104 Harvey Lane Plano TX 75025-5302 / US | 03 /
RUMMEL, Kerrin, A. 315 Ridgebriar Drive Richardson TX 75080-1920 / US | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08843105.1 | 28.08.2008 | [2010/26] | WO2008US74539 | Priority number, date | US20070876301 | 22.10.2007 Original published format: US 876301 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009055141 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2201312 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F25B25/00 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
F25B25/005 (EP,US);
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
H01Q1/02 (EP,US);
H05K7/20281 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KÜHLUNG ANHAND ZWEIER SEPARATER KÜHLMITTEL | [2010/26] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COOLING USING TWO SEPARATE COOLANTS | [2010/26] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE REFROIDISSEMENT METTANT EN OEUVRE DEUX RÉFRIGÉRANTS SÉPARÉS | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 14.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2002228321 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5819549 (SHERWOOD GREGORY J [US]) [X] 1,5,7,16 [A] 3,4,8-15,17-26; | [XA]EP1380799 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [X] 1,5-7,14,16 * paragraph [0024]; figure 2 * [A] 2-4,8,11-13,15; | [X]US2007165377 (RASMUSSEN NEIL [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8,13,16 * paragraphs [0060] , [0083] , [0084]; figures 2,5 *; | [XA]GB2258298 (STAR REFRIGERATION [GB]) [X] 1,5,7,16 * page 1, paragraph L - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 2; figure 1 * [A] 4,8,13,15,24,26 |