EP2203158 - PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING TELMISARTAN AND HYDROCHLOROTHIAZIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. 7-1-27 Ameerpet Hyderabad 500 016 AP / IN | For all designated states Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. 200 Somerset Corporate Boulevard 7th Floor Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALAPARTHI, Uma Devi Flat No. 202 NRI Residency Bhagyanagar Colony Opp. KPHB Hyderabad 500 072 Andhra Pradesh / IN | 02 /
ROUT, Ashutosh Jamusara Mohimagadi Dhenkanal District 759 014 Orissa / IN | 03 /
ARUMALLA, Maheswara Reddy Plot No. 790 Vasanta Nagar Colony Kukatpally Hyderabad 500 072 Andhra Pradesh / IN | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road GB-London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08843372.7 | 30.10.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008US81714 | Priority number, date | IN2007CHE2464 | 30.10.2007 Original published format: IN CH24642007 | US20080025838 | 04.02.2008 Original published format: US 25838 | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009058950 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2203158 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/24, A61K9/26, A61K31/4184, A61K9/16, A61K31/54, A61K31/549 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
A61K9/5084 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,US);
A61K31/549 (EP,US);
A61K9/1623 (EP,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
A61K9/209 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4184, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/549, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2010/27] | A61K9/20, A61K9/24, A61K9/26, A61K31/4184 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN MIT TELMISARTAN UND HYDROCHLORTHIAZID | [2010/27] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING TELMISARTAN AND HYDROCHLOROTHIAZIDE | [2010/27] | French: | FORMULATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES COMPRENANT DU TELMISARTAN ET DE L'HYDROCHLOROTIAZIDE | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 20.05.2011 | Observations by third parties | 25.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 31.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03059327 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * examples 2,3,4 *; | [X]WO2004096215 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * example 5 *; | [X]US2005186274 (KOHLRAUSCH ANJA [DE]) [X] 1-13 * examples 6,7 *; | [X]US2006159747 (SCHUMACHER HELMUT E [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0058] - [0080]; example 2 *; | [X]WO2007060170 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * example - *; | [XP]WO2007144175 (LEK PHARMACEUTICALS [SI], et al) [XP] 1-13 * examples 1-5 *; | [XP]WO2008110599 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [XP] 1-13* example 4 * | International search | [X]US2003035839 (HIRSH JANE C [US], et al); | [X]US2004110813 (NAKATANI MANABU [JP], et al); | [X]WO2005039639 (SOLVAY PHARM GMBH [DE]); | [X]US2005186274 (KOHLRAUSCH ANJA [DE]) | other | WO03059327 | WO2006063737 | WO2007060170 | WO2007144175 |