EP2211559 - REMOTE MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAI, Seiji c/o Shiga Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1000-2 Aza Ootani Okamoto-cho Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-8526 / JP | 02 /
IWATA, Masataka c/o Shiga Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1000-2 Aza Ootani Okamoto-cho Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-8526 / JP | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08843574.8 | 28.10.2008 | [2010/30] | WO2008JP69492 | Priority number, date | JP20070284443 | 31.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007284443 | [2010/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009057571 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2211559 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/00, H04M11/00 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
H04Q9/00 (EP,US);
G06Q10/20 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/10 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | FERNÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2010/30] | English: | REMOTE MONITORING SYSTEM | [2010/30] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE À DISTANCE | [2010/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2010 | Translation filed | 19.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 08.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0848215 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9 * column 5, line 45 - column 7, line 53; figures 1-3 *; | [E]EP2208944 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1-9 * paragraph [0039]; figure 1 ** paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0054]; figures 3,4,6,7 * | International search | [A]JP2002003114 (MITSUBISHI ELEC BUILDING TECHN); | [A]JP2003209940 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [A]JP2005196341 (DAIKIN IND LTD) |