EP2211884 - HYDROLYSATES MADE OF PLANT EXTRACTS AND ANTIBACTERIAL AGENT CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIONORICA SE Kerschensteinerstrasse 11 -15 92318 Neumarkt / DE | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONN, Günther, K. Bahnhofumgebung 3 A-6170 Zirl / AT | 02 /
STECHER, Günther Oberer Feldweg 30 A-6091 Götzens / AT | 03 /
POPP, Michael, A. Weinbergstrasse 3 91207 Lauf / DE | 04 /
MAYER, Robert Koglmoos 465 A-6236 Alpbach / AT | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Simandi, Claus Simandi Patentanwälte Kurfürstendamm 45 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Simandi, Claus Patentanwalt Höhenstrasse 26 53773 Hennef / Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2010/31] | Simandi, Claus Patentanwalt Höhenstrasse 26 53773 Hennef / Bonn / DE | Application number, filing date | 08844034.2 | 30.10.2008 | [2010/31] | WO2008EP09171 | Priority number, date | DE20071052223 | 31.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007052223 | [2010/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009056316 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2211884 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2211884 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/85, A61K36/35, A61K36/185, A61K36/51, A61K36/70 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61K36/35 (EP,US);
A61K36/51 (EP,US);
A61K36/515 (US);
A61K36/70 (EP,US);
A61K36/85 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | HYDROLYSATE AUS PFLANZENEXTRAKTEN SOWIE DIESE ENTHALTENDES ANTIBAKTERIELLES MITTEL | [2010/31] | English: | HYDROLYSATES MADE OF PLANT EXTRACTS AND ANTIBACTERIAL AGENT CONTAINING THE SAME | [2010/31] | French: | HYDROLYSATS D'EXTRAITS VÉGÉTAUX ET AGENT ANTI-BACTÉRIEN LES CONTENANT | [2010/31] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 16.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.01.2012 | EE | 25.01.2012 | FI | 25.01.2012 | HR | 25.01.2012 | IE | 25.01.2012 | LV | 25.01.2012 | MT | 25.01.2012 | RO | 25.01.2012 | SI | 25.01.2012 | BG | 25.04.2012 | NO | 25.04.2012 | GR | 26.04.2012 | IS | 25.05.2012 | PT | 25.05.2012 | [2013/51] |
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 25.01.2012 | |
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 25.01.2012 | |
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 25.01.2012 | |
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BG | 25.04.2012 | |
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | NO | 25.04.2012 | |
IS | 25.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [ ] - No relevant documents disclosed |