EP2214734 - USE OF A REGENERATIVE BIOFUNCTIONAL COLLAGEN BIOMATRIX FOR TREATING VISCERAL OR PARIETAL DEFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | For all designated states Baxter Healthcare SA Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODAR, Johann Hummelbergstrasse 28 69242 Muehlhausen / DE | 02 /
NISTOR-GALLO, Raymond Prinz-Solms-Strasse 15 A-2500 Baden / AT | 03 /
CALIARI, Laura Viale Alfredo Ottaviani 107 I-00126 Rome / IT | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/50] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2010/32] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 08844346.0 | 29.10.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008EP09139 | Priority number, date | US20070983776P | 30.10.2007 Original published format: US 983776 P | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009056298 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2214734 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2214734 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/14, A61L31/04 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
A61L31/044 (EP,KR,US);
A61L31/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/32] | A61L27/24, A61L27/54, A61L31/04, A61L31/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/50] |
Former [2010/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 21.05.2010 | BA | 21.05.2010 | MK | 21.05.2010 | RS | 21.05.2010 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER REGENERATIVEN BIOFUNKTIONALEN KOLLAGEN-BIOMATRIX ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VISZERALEN ODER PARIETALEN DEFEKTEN | [2010/32] | English: | USE OF A REGENERATIVE BIOFUNCTIONAL COLLAGEN BIOMATRIX FOR TREATING VISCERAL OR PARIETAL DEFECTS | [2010/32] | French: | UTILISATION DE BIOMATRICE DE COLLAGÈNE BIOFONCTIONNELLE RÉNÉGÉRATRICE PERMETTANT DE TRAITER DES LÉSIONS PARIÉTALES OU VISCÉRALES | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 26.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2008 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | SE | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | BG | 13.03.2018 | NO | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/27] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0781564 (SHIMIZU YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-7,9,16-18,20-23,25-28,30-36 * page 2, lines 5-8 * * page 3, lines 20-22, 30-37, 46-48 * * page 4, lines 15-27, 31-37, 53-55 * * page 5, lines 20-31, 45-49 * * claims 1-8, 11-13 * [I] 8,11-15,29; | [X]US2001016205 (SHIMIZU YASUHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-10,16-17,19-22,24-28,30-32 * paragraphs [0001] , [0000] , [00 8] , [00 9] , [0 13] , [0 24] - [0026] - [0 39] ** claims 1, 2, 4, 8, 10, 11 * | Examination | EP1484070 | EP2021045 |