EP2215397 - TRIPOD HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): HR | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLM GmbH Foto-, Licht- und Meßtechnisches Zubehör Schützenstrasse 18 79312 Emmendingen / DE | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜRKLIN, Werner Schützenstraße 18 79312 Emmendingen / DE | [2010/32] | Representative(s) | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | Application number, filing date | 08844824.6 | 21.10.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008EP08892 | Priority number, date | DE20071052039 | 30.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007052039 | [2010/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009056249 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2215397 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2215397 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/04, F16M11/14 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
F16M11/14 (EP,US);
F16C11/106 (EP,US);
F16M11/041 (EP,US);
F16M11/16 (EP,US);
G03B17/566 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32745 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Title | German: | STATIVKOPF | [2010/32] | English: | TRIPOD HEAD | [2010/32] | French: | TETE DE TREPIED | [2011/17] |
Former [2010/32] | TÊTE DE TRÉPIED | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 09.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10013252.1 / EP2273178 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | HR | 11.05.2011 | HU | 11.05.2011 | IE | 11.05.2011 | LT | 11.05.2011 | LV | 11.05.2011 | MT | 11.05.2011 | NL | 11.05.2011 | PL | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | TR | 11.05.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | NO | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | ES | 22.08.2011 | IS | 11.09.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | LU | 21.10.2011 | BE | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/51] |
Former [2013/45] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
HU | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
TR | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
LU | 21.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
TR | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
LU | 21.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
LU | 21.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
LU | 21.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/27] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
NO | 11.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3612462 (MOONEY PAUL C, et al) [X] 4,6 * figures 3-5 ** column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 42 *; | [X]FR2799807 (GITZO HOLDING [FR]) [X] 1,3 * figures 1-4 * * page 4 - page 8 *; | [XY]EP1365187 (SWAROVSKI OPTIK KG [AT]) [X] 4-6 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0031] * [Y] 7; | [XY]EP1473510 (VOGT PHILIPPE [CH]) [X] 1,3 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025] * [Y] 7; | [X]US2007147829 (TERATANI KAZUMI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 9,10 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * | by applicant | DE2747677 | FR2799807 | EP1473510 | US2007147829 | DE102007001580 |