EP2205708 - CONTINUOUS METHOD FOR THE HETEROGENICALLY CATALYZED ESTERIFICATION OF FATTY ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Chemicals LLC 100 Independence Mall West Philadelpia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [2014/31] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states Bayer Technology Services GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINZ, Dieter F3 Muhua Road Shanghai Chemica Shanghai 201507 / CN | 02 /
MLECZKO, Leslaw Quittenweg 1 41542 Dormagen / DE | 03 /
ROY, Shaibal Berrenrather Str. 311 50937 Köln / DE | 04 /
MORHENN, Heinrich Grevenbroicher Str. 104 50829 Köln / DE | 05 /
DIETRICH, Wulf Clarenbachstr. 186 50931 Köln / DE | [2010/28] | Representative(s) | Neugebauer, Jürgen Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [2014/32] |
Former [2014/31] | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | BIP Patents Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/44] | Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08844944.2 | 16.10.2008 | [2010/28] | WO2008EP08763 | Priority number, date | DE20071052065 | 30.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007052065 | [2010/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009056231 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2205708 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C11C3/00, C11C3/10, C07C67/03, C07C67/08, C07C69/52 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
C07C67/03 (EP,US);
C07C67/08 (EP,US);
C11C3/003 (EP,US);
C11C3/10 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/03, C07C69/52 (EP,US);
C07C67/08, C07C69/52 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2010/28] | C11B3/02, C11C3/00, C07C67/03, C07C67/08, C07C69/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/28] | Title | German: | KONTINUIERLICHES VERFAHREN ZUR HETEROGEN KATALYSIERTEN VERESTERUNG VON FETTSÄUREN | [2010/28] | English: | CONTINUOUS METHOD FOR THE HETEROGENICALLY CATALYZED ESTERIFICATION OF FATTY ACIDS | [2010/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ EN CONTINU D'ESTÉRIFICATION CATALYSÉE HÉTÉROGÈNE DES ACIDES GRAS | [2010/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 03.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/42] | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]DE19600025 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DY] 6,7,12* example - *; | [XY]WO2007083213 (MERLONI PROGETTI S P A [IT], et al) [X] 1-5,8-15 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 13; example - * [Y] 6,7,12; | [XY]WO2007093326 (ASER S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1-5,8-15 * page 10, line 17 - line 20 * * page 2, lines 13-22 * * example - * * page 9, lines 7-10 * [Y] 6,7,12 | Examination | CN101016473 |