EP2205691 - ADDITIVES FOR IMPROVED ADHESION TO OILY SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LORD Corporation 111 Lord Drive Cary, NC 27511 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states Lord Corporation 111 Lord Drive Cary, NC 27511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRESSLEY, Mark, W. 6824 Wade Drive Cary, NC 27519 / US | 02 /
ABBEY, Kirk, J. 107 Lyme Court Garner NC 27529 / US | 03 /
CASE, Sandra, L. 205 Holly Thorn Trace Holly Springs NC 27540 / US | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/28] | 01 /
PRESSLEY, Mark, W. 6824 Wade Drive Apex NC 27502 / US | ||
02 /
ABBEY, Kirk, J. 107 Lyme Court Garner NC 27529 / US | |||
03 /
CASE, Sandra, L. 205 Holly Thorn Trace Holly Springs NC 27540 / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08845204.0 | 30.10.2008 | [2010/28] | WO2008US81792 | Priority number, date | US20070983947P | 31.10.2007 Original published format: US 983947 P | [2010/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009059007 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2205691 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/00, C09J133/04, C09J11/06, C09J133/02, C09J11/08, C08K5/01, C09J163/00 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
C09J11/06 (EP,US);
C09J133/02 (EP,US);
C09J163/00 (EP,US);
C09J5/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/01 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L2666/22 (EP,US);
C08L33/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J133/02, C08L2666/22 (US,EP);
C09J163/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09J163/00, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/28] | C09J11/08, C08K5/01, C09J163/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/28] | Title | German: | ADDITIVE ZUR VERBESSERTEN HAFTUNG AN ÖLIGEN SUBSTRATEN | [2010/28] | English: | ADDITIVES FOR IMPROVED ADHESION TO OILY SUBSTRATES | [2010/28] | French: | ADDITIFS POUR UNE ADHÉSION AMÉLIORÉE À DES SUBSTRATS HUILEUX | [2010/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 13.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5629380 (BALDWIN JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1,6-20,25-37 * column 8, line 5 - column 9, line 53; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9721735 (LORD CORP [US]) [X] 1,6-20,25-37 * page 15, lines 23-25; examples 1,5 *; | [X]EP1655346 (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC [JP]) [X] 1,6-20,25-37 * paragraphs [0001] , [0031] - [0034]; table 1 *; | [DX]US2006264573 (BENNETT RUTH M [US], et al) [DX] 1,6-20,25-37* paragraphs [0029] - [0031] * |