20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
14.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
27.01.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
28.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
02.09.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
29.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
19.02.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
29.01.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.01.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.10.2011 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
28.10.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
28.10.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
14.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.01.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] |
19.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.06.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] |
04.06.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] |
18.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|