Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2245242 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2015 | B1 | EP2245242 | 03.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | PL38366407 | 02.11.2007 | WO2008PL00076 | 31.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009058039 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | PL38366407 | 02.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL220967B | 29.02.2016 | B1 | PL383664 | 11.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | PL38366407 | 02.11.2007 |