EP2245242 - TILTING AND TURNING WINDOW, ESPECIALLY ROOF WINDOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fakro PP Spolka Z O.O. Ul. Wegierska 144a 33-300 Nowy Sacz / PL | [2015/42] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Fakro PP Spolka Z O.O. Ul. Wegierska 144a 33-300 Nowy Sacz / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZWYRTEK, Bronislaw u. Smetanova 11 737 01 Cesky Tesin / CZ | 02 /
MUSIAL, Henryk ul. Dobczycka 3 PL-32-020 Wieliczka / PL | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/39] |
Former [2011/21] | Lukaszyk, Szymon, et al Kancelaria Patentowa Lukaszyk ul. Glowackiego 8/6 40-062 Katowice / PL | ||
Former [2010/44] | Kacperski, Andrzej Kancelaria Prawno-Patentowa ul. Kupa 3/9 31-057 Krakow / PL | Application number, filing date | 08845734.6 | 31.10.2008 | [2010/44] | WO2008PL00076 | Priority number, date | PL20070383664 | 02.11.2007 Original published format: PL 38366407 | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009058039 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2245242 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2245242 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/035, E05D1/04, E05D7/084, E05D15/48, E05D15/56 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
E05D1/04 (EP);
E04D13/0357 (EP);
E05D15/48 (EP);
E05D7/084 (EP);
E05D15/56 (EP);
E05D3/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2010/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KLAPP-SCHWING-FENSTER, INSBESONDERE DACHFENSTER | [2015/30] | English: | TILTING AND TURNING WINDOW, ESPECIALLY ROOF WINDOW | [2010/44] | French: | FENÊTRE BASCULANTE ET BATTANTE, FENÊTRE DE TOIT NOTAMMENT | [2010/44] |
Former [2010/44] | KIPP- UND DREHFENSTER, BESONDERS DACHFENSTER | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 09.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 02.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 09.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 09.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 09.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 09.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 09.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 09.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 09.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 09.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2008 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BE | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | ES | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | HR | 14.10.2015 | IT | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | MT | 14.10.2015 | NL | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | IE | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | LU | 31.10.2015 | FR | 14.12.2015 | NO | 14.01.2016 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | PT | 15.02.2016 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 31.10.2008 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
IE | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 14.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
IE | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 14.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
IE | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 14.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
IE | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
IE | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005106174 (FAKRO PP SPOLKA Z O O [PL]; FLOREK RYSZARD [PL]; ZWYRTEK BRONISLAV [CZ) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE2438437 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST) [Y] 1-13 * page 10 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 13, paragraph L * * figures 2,3,5 *; | [Y]WO9004077 (RASMUSSEN KANN IND AS [DK]) [Y] 1-13 * page 4, paragraph 1 * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2005042890 (FAKRO PP SPOLKA Z O O [PL]; FLOREK RYSZARD [PL]; ZWYRTEK BRONISLAV [CZ) [A] 1,2,4-12 * the whole document * |