EP2220157 - CELLULOSE ETHER COATING COMPOSITIONS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2016/33] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | ||
Former [2010/34] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies Inc. 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROGERS, True, L. 2111 Burlington Drive Midland MI 48642 / US | 02 /
HOLBROOK, Debora, L. 5511 North Shore Pinconning MI 48650 / US | 03 /
COPPENS, Karen, A. 5810 Windy Gyle Midland MI 48640 / US | 04 /
SCHMITT, Robert, L. 40 Regional Road Annandale NJ 08801 / US | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | f & e patent Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2013/22] | polypatent BGL Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2010/34] | Godemeyer, Thomas Fleischer Godemeyer Kierdorf Polypatent Braunberger feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 08846333.6 | 05.11.2008 | [2010/34] | WO2008US82485 | Priority number, date | US20070986731P | 09.11.2007 Original published format: US 986731 P | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009061821 | Date: | 14.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2220157 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2220157 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L1/26, C09D101/26 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
C08L1/26 (EP,US);
C08L1/284 (EP,KR,US);
C09D101/26 (EP,US);
C09D101/284 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2010/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZELLULOSEETHER-BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | [2010/34] | English: | CELLULOSE ETHER COATING COMPOSITIONS AND METHOD | [2010/34] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE REVÊTEMENT D'ÉTHER CELLULOSIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2010/34] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11002238.1 / EP2325247 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2008 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | IT | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | MT | 05.11.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 05.11.2008 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 05.11.2008 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.11.2008 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5681382 (KOKUBO HIROYASU [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * claims 1, 4 * * page 4, paragraph 57 * * column 3, line 32 - line 45 * * column 4, line 31 - line 51 *; | [X]WO0203967 (SEPPIC SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-7,9-10 * claims 1, 4, 8-10, 14, 19 *; | [X]US2002136843 (CHOPRA DIVYA [CA], et al) [X] 11,18,22 * claims , 4,, 5, * * column 3, line 32 - line 45 * * column 4, line 31 - line 51 * * column 4, paragraph 57 - column 5, paragraph 57 *; | [A]WO03011257 (SINGH JASJIT [IN], et al) [A] 1,18 * claims 1, 2, 5, 12 * | by applicant | US5681382 | US2002136843 |