EP2218227 - CHANNEL ESTIMATION FOR SYNCHRONIZED CELLS IN A CELLULAR COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDOFF, Bengt Morkullevägen 45 S-237 36 Bjärred / SE | 02 /
NORDSTRÖM, Fredrik Lilla Tvärgatan 16A S-223 53 Lund / SE | [2010/33] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | Åkerman, Mårten Lennart, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms Nya Vattentornet 221 83 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2010/40] | Akerman, Marten Lennart, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms Nya Vattentornet 221 83 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2010/33] | Bratt, Hanna Catharina, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms Nya Vattentornet 221 83 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 08846634.7 | 05.11.2008 | [2010/33] | WO2008EP64976 | Priority number, date | US20070986146P | 07.11.2007 Original published format: US 986146 P | US20080203649 | 03.09.2008 Original published format: US 203649 | [2010/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009059986 | Date: | 14.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2218227 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2218227 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, H04L5/00 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
H04J11/0086 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (EP,US);
H04L25/022 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KANALSCHÄTZUNG FÜR SYNCHRONISIERTE FUNKZELLEN IN EINEM ZELLULAREN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2014/27] | English: | CHANNEL ESTIMATION FOR SYNCHRONIZED CELLS IN A CELLULAR COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2010/33] | French: | ESTIMATION DE VOIE POUR CELLULES SYNCHRONISÉES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION CELLULAIRE | [2010/33] |
Former [2010/33] | KANALSCHÄTZUNG FÜR SYNCHRONISIERTE ZELLEN IN EINEM ZELLULAREN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 08.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2008 | AT | 07.01.2015 | BE | 07.01.2015 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | ES | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | HR | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | NL | 07.01.2015 | PL | 07.01.2015 | PT | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | NO | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 05.11.2008 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 07.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007242782 (HAN KI-YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0035] *; | [A]EP1473956 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] *; | [A] - YE (GEOFFREY) LI, "Simplified Channel Estimation for OFDM Systems With Multiple Transmit Antennas", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20020101), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1536-1276, XP011064372 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 71, column 1, line 5 - page 73, column 1, line 2 * * figure 3 * * TABLE I * | by applicant | US2007242782 | - YE (GEOFFREY) LI, "Simplified Channel Estimation for OFDM Systems With Multiple Transmit Antennas", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20020101), vol. 1, no. 1 |