Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
13.12.2013 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
13.12.2013 | Change - classification | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
25.10.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.10.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.07.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
27.10.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.08.2010 | Change - filing language | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
06.08.2010 | Change - representative | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
16.07.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
16.07.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
21.06.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.06.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.06.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.06.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.06.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.05.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication |