EP2217874 - HEAT EXCHANGER AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF HEAT EXCHANGING PIPE COMPOSING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyungdong Navien Co., Ltd. 437, Segyo-dong Pyungtaek-si Gyunggi-do 450-818 / KR | [2010/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIN, Tae-Sik Seohee Villa 202 79-11 Heukseok-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-858 / KR | [2010/33] | Representative(s) | Witzany, Manfred, et al Patentanwalt Falkenstrasse 4 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Witzany, Manfred, et al Patentanwalt Falkenstrasse 4 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [2010/33] | Witzany, Manfred Patentanwalt Falkenstrasse 4 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 08847173.5 | 21.10.2008 | [2010/33] | WO2008KR06227 | Priority number, date | KR20070113986 | 08.11.2007 Original published format: KR 20070113986 | [2010/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009061086 | Date: | 14.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2217874 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/047 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
F28D7/08 (EP,US);
F28D1/047 (KR);
F24H1/40 (EP,US);
F28D1/04 (KR);
F28F1/02 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49391 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/33] | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN WÄRMETAUSCHERROHR DAFÜR | [2010/33] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF HEAT EXCHANGING PIPE COMPOSING IT | [2010/33] | French: | ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DU TUBE ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR LE CONSTITUANT | [2010/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 25.07.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]IES62442 (VIANIT LIMITED [IE]) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 23; figure 5 *; | [X]JP2000176579 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024]; figure - *; | [X]US3964873 (ARAMAKI SEIGO, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 43 - line 46; figure 3 *; | [X]US1374021 (CARL MCNEELY) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 67 - line 82; figure 6 * | International search | [X]JPH06201291 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP); | [A]JPH08296987 (HUDSON PRODUCTS CORP); | [A]KR20000003491U (DAEWOO MECHATRONICS CO., LTD.) |