EP2227545 - MODULATION OF FACTOR 7 EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ionis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2016/07] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Isis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | ||
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states Isis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1896 Rutherford Road Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREIER, Susan, M. 2946 Renault Street San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 02 /
MONIA, Brett, P. 2306 Casa Hermosa Court Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Hong 3339 Cadencia St. Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 04 /
CROSBY, Jeffrey, R. 2292 B Chinquapin Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | 05 /
ZHAO, Chenguang 5809 Brittany Forrest Lane San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2010/37] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08847806.0 | 05.11.2008 | [2010/37] | WO2008US82526 | Priority number, date | US20070986928P | 09.11.2007 Original published format: US 986928 P | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009061851 | Date: | 14.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2227545 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, A61K31/7088, A61P7/02 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
C12N15/1137 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C12Y304/21021 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3341 (EP,US);
C12N2310/341 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/37] | Title | German: | MODULATION DER EXPRESSION VON FAKTOR 7 | [2010/37] | English: | MODULATION OF FACTOR 7 EXPRESSION | [2010/37] | French: | MODULATION DE L'EXPRESSION DU FACTEUR 7 | [2010/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 20.09.2013 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 30.10.2013 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 15.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/17] | Divisional application(s) | EP15192408.1 / EP3000884 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2004016754 (PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al) [X] 19-23,26,27,30,31 * page 135 * * page 24, paragraph 40 * * page 25, paragraph 42; claims 13,17 * * pages 52-53, paragraph 105 * [Y] 28,29; | [Y] - BECKER R C ET AL, "NUCLEIC ACID APTAMERS IN THERAPEUTIC ANTICOAGULATION TECHNOLOGY, DEVELOPMENT AND CLINICAL APPLICATION", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, STUTTGART, DE, (20050601), vol. 93, no. 6, ISSN 0340-6245, pages 1014 - 1020, XP009055852 [Y] 1-18,24,25,32,33 * page 1016, column L, paragraph 2; figure 3 * * page 1014, column R, lines 1-3 * | [Y] - SHIRK REBECCA A ET AL, "Inhibitors of Factor VIIa/tissue factor.", ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THROMBOSIS, AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY SEP 2007, (200709), vol. 27, no. 9, ISSN 1524-4636, pages 1895 - 1900, XP002526314 [Y] 1-18,24,25,28,29,32,33 * abstract * * page 1899, column L, paragraphs 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/ATVBAHA.107.148304 | Examination | WO2004094636 | WO2006020768 | - JOHN MATTHIAS ET AL, "Effective RNAi-mediated gene silencing without interruption of the endogenous microRNA pathway", NATURE: INTERNATIONAL WEEKLY JOURNAL OF SCIENCE (AND SUPPLEMENTARY INFORMATION), NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, UNITED KINGDOM, (20071001), vol. 449, no. 7163, doi:10.1038/NATURE06179, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 745 - 748, XP002519570 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NATURE06179 | - GREG HANNON ET AL, "Small hairpin RNA (shRNA) probe V2HS_83726 for Homo sapiens gene coagulation factor VII (F7)", PROBE, XP002566899 | by applicant | WO9914226 | US2004171570 | US7399845 | US7427672 | WO2008US64591 | WO2008US68922 |