EP2207513 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING IMPROVED SOFTNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWSON, Kathleen, Marie 4318 Flagstone Drive Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 02 /
HUNDORF, Harald, Hermann Koenigstrasse 78 D-53115 Bonn / DE | 03 /
BERUDA, Holger Berliner Strasse 14 65824 Schwalbach Hessen / DE | 04 /
BLESSING, Horst 3563 Mooney Avenue Cincinnati Ohio 45208 / US | 05 /
DZIEZOK, Peter Auf Der Schlicht 56A 65239 Hochheim Hessen / DE | 06 /
KRAUSE, Axel Reinoldweg 13 50374 Erfstadt / DE | 07 /
SCHMIDT, Mattias Charlotte-Rosenthal-Str. 21 D-65510 Idestein Hessen / DE | 08 /
STELZIG, Lutz Battenbergerweg 33 D-60489 Frankfurt Am Main / DE | [2010/32] |
Former [2010/29] | 01 /
LAWSON, Kathleen, Marie 8007 Pepper Pike West Chester Ohio 45069 / US | ||
02 /
HUNDORF, Harald, Hermann Koenigstrasse 78 D-53115 Bonn / DE | |||
03 /
BERUDA, Holger Berliner Strasse 14 65824 Schwalbach Hessen / DE | |||
04 /
BLESSING, Horst 3563 Mooney Avenue Cincinnati Ohio 45208 / US | |||
05 /
DZIEZOK, Peter Auf Der Schlicht 56A 65239 Hochheim Hessen / DE | |||
06 /
KRAUSE, Axel Reinoldweg 13 50374 Erfstadt / DE | |||
07 /
SCHMIDT, Mattias Charlotte-Rosenthal-Str. 21 D-65510 Idestein Hessen / DE | |||
08 /
STELZIG, Lutz Battenbergerweg 33 D-60489 Frankfurt Am Main / DE | Representative(s) | Heide, Ute, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Heide, Ute, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2011/12] | McGregor, Judit Ester, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2010/29] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 08848102.3 | 04.11.2008 | [2010/29] | WO2008IB54593 | Priority number, date | US20070986153P | 07.11.2007 Original published format: US 986153 P | US20080182386 | 30.07.2008 Original published format: US 182386 | [2010/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009060384 | Date: | 14.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2207513 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2207513 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
A61F13/5323 (EP,US);
A61F13/51401 (EP,US);
A61F13/51405 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/29] | Title | German: | SAUGFÄHIGER ARTIKEL MIT ERHÖHTER WEICHHEIT | [2010/29] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING IMPROVED SOFTNESS | [2010/29] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT AYANT UNE DOUCEUR AMÉLIORÉE | [2010/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 23.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2008 | AT | 21.12.2011 | BE | 21.12.2011 | CY | 21.12.2011 | CZ | 21.12.2011 | DK | 21.12.2011 | EE | 21.12.2011 | FI | 21.12.2011 | HR | 21.12.2011 | LT | 21.12.2011 | LV | 21.12.2011 | MT | 21.12.2011 | RO | 21.12.2011 | SE | 21.12.2011 | SI | 21.12.2011 | SK | 21.12.2011 | BG | 21.03.2012 | NO | 21.03.2012 | GR | 22.03.2012 | IS | 21.04.2012 | PT | 23.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/51] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 21.12.2011 | |
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 21.12.2011 | |
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 21.12.2011 | |
NO | 21.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0780325 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 3,5-9 * column 1, line 8; claim 1 ** column 4, line 25 - line 38; claim 8 *; | [A]US2002117419 (TIPPEY DAROLD DEAN [US], et al) [A] 3,5,9 * paragraph [0074]; figures 1-13 *; | [XY]US2004162536 (BECKER UWE JURGEN [DE], et al) [X] 5,10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0022] , [0053] , [0025] , [0046] - [0059]; figures 1,3-6 * [Y] 1-4,6-9; | [AD]US2004167486 (BUSAM LUDWIG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [YD]US2006057921 (TURI MORDECHAI [US], et al) [YD] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0060] , [0032]; claim 13 *; | [A]US2007167928 (BECKER UWE J [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |