EP2217697 - USE OF LINGO-4 ANTAGONISTS IN THE TREATMENT OF CONDITIONS INVOLVING DEMYELINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HR, HU, MT, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogen MA Inc. 250 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2015/24] |
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states Biogen Idec MA Inc. 14 Cambridge Center Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MI, Sha 4 Vernon Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 02 /
PEPINSKY, R., Blake 30 Falmouth Road Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 03 /
MCCOY, John 56 Howard Street Reading, MA 01867 / US | [2010/33] | Representative(s) | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2015/24] |
Former [2010/33] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08848257.5 | 10.11.2008 | [2010/33] | WO2008US12620 | Priority number, date | US20070986492P | 08.11.2007 Original published format: US 986492 P | [2010/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009061500 | Date: | 14.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2217697 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2217697 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, A01N37/18, A61K31/70, C07K14/705, A61K38/17, C07K14/46 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (US);
C07K14/70503 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (US);
C12N5/0622 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
C07K2319/30 (US);
|
Former IPC [2010/33] | C12N5/00, A01N37/18, A61K31/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2010/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 08.06.2010 | BA | 08.06.2010 | MK | 08.06.2010 | RS | 08.06.2010 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON LINGO-4-ANTAGONISTEN BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON LEIDEN MIT DEMYELINIERUNG | [2010/33] | English: | USE OF LINGO-4 ANTAGONISTS IN THE TREATMENT OF CONDITIONS INVOLVING DEMYELINATION | [2010/33] | French: | UTILISATION DES ANTAGONISTES DE LINGO-4 DANS LE TRAITEMENT D'ÉTATS METTANT EN JEU UNE DÉMYÉLINATION | [2010/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 07.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.11.2008 | AT | 10.06.2015 | BE | 10.06.2015 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | ES | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | HR | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | MT | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | SE | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | TR | 10.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | NO | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | IE | 10.11.2015 | LU | 10.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
IE | 10.11.2015 | ||
LU | 10.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
IE | 10.11.2015 | ||
LU | 10.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 10.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 10.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007178088 (WU SHUJIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * sequence 6 * * claims 1-12 * * page 2, column r, paragraphs [13], [14] * * page 6, paragraphs [89], [90], [98]-[102] * * page 144 - page 146; examples 31, 32 * [Y] 1-14 | [Y] - MI S ET AL, "LINGO-1 Negatively Regulates Myelination by Oligodendrocytes", NATURE NEUROSCIENCE, NATURE AMERICA, INC, US, (20050601), vol. 8, no. 6, doi:10.1038/NN1460, ISSN 1097-6256, pages 745 - 751, XP003005584 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * page 746, column l, paragraph l - page 747, column l, line 3 * * page 747, column r, paragraph 3 - page 748, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 748, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn1460 | [Y] - MI SHA ET AL, "LINGO-1 antagonist promotes spinal cord remyelination and axonal integrity in MOG-induced experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 13, no. 10, doi:10.1038/NM1664, ISSN 1078-8956, (20070930), pages 1228 - 1233, (20070930), XP002525677 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * page 1232, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NM1664 | [Y] - LEE XINHUA ET AL, "NGF REGULATES THE EXPRESSION OF AXONAL LINGO-1 TO INHIBIT OLIGODENDROCYTE DIFFERENTIATION AND MYELINATION", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20070103), vol. 27, no. 1, doi:10.1523/JNEUROSCI.4175-06.2007, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 220 - 225, XP002559457 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * page 221, column l, lines 1-14 * * page 222, column l, paragraph 2 - page 223, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.4175-06.2007 | [Y] - HAINES ET AL, "Expression of the Lingo/LERN gene family during mouse embryogenesis", GENE EXPRESSION PATTERNS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071022), vol. 8, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.MODGEP.2007.10.003, ISSN 1567-133X, pages 79 - 86, XP022418642 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * page 79, column r, paragraph l - page 81, column l, paragraph 1; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.modgep.2007.10.003 | International search | [Y]WO2007092370 (WYETH CORP [US], et al); | [Y]WO2006136006 (UNIV MCGILL [CA], et al); | [Y]US5605690 (JACOBS CINDY A [US], et al); | [Y]WO03054152 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2006067935 (AMBATI JAYAKRISHNA [US]); | [Y]US2007213290 (KINGSMAN ALAN J [GB], et al) | by applicant | - LI; ROLLER, CURR. TOP. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 3, pages 325 - 341 | - CAPODICI ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 169, pages 5196 - 5201 | - CALEGARI ET AL., PROC NATI ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 14236 - 14240 | - ZHOU ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2002), vol. 30, pages 1664 - 1669 | - LEWIS ET AL., NAT GENET, (2002), vol. 32, pages 107 - 108 | - MCCAFFREY ET AL., NATURE, (2002), vol. 418, pages 38 - 39 | - BERTRAND ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2002), vol. 296, pages 1000 - 1004 | - LASSUS ET AL., SCI STKE, (2002), page PL13 | - LEIRDAL ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2002), vol. 295, pages 744 - 748 | - HOHJOH, FEBS LETT, (2002), vol. 521, pages 195 - 199 | - YANG ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 9942 - 9947 | - DONZEET ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2002), vol. 30, page E46 | - YU ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 6047 - 6052 |