EP2209962 - DOOR DRIVE IN MODULAR DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/30] | DOOR DRIVE | ||
[2014/36] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2021 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORMA Deutschland GmbH Dorma Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2021/31] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states DORMA Deutschland GmbH DORMA Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | ||
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states Dorma GmbH + Co. KG DORMA Platz 1 58256 Ennepetal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖMER, Martin Wiesenstrasse 12B 58339 Breckerfeld / DE | 02 /
HUFEN, Michael Oberwall 25 42289 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
HELLWIG, Alexander Leibnizstrasse 53 58256 Ennepetal / DE | 04 /
HÄNSCH, Holger Rigeikenstrasse 59 58452 Witten / DE | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2021/31] |
Former [2015/24] | Balder IP Law, S.L. Castellana 93 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 08849006.5 | 13.11.2008 | [2010/30] | WO2008EP09647 | Priority number, date | DE20071054460 | 13.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007054460 | DE20071054462 | 13.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007054462 | DE20071054464 | 13.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007054464 | DE20071054463 | 13.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007054463 | [2010/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009062729 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2209962 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2209962 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2209962 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/00, E05F3/22 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
E05F3/10 (EP,US);
E05F15/603 (EP,US);
E05F15/611 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/434 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/326 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/334 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/458 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/524 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/53 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/626 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/205 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/232 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/132 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/30] | E05F15/10, E05F15/12, E05F3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2010/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TÜRANTRIEB | [2010/30] | English: | DOOR DRIVE IN MODULAR DESIGN | [2014/36] | French: | ENTRAÎNEMENT DE PORTE À CONSTRUCTION MODULAIRE | [2014/36] |
Former [2010/30] | DOOR DRIVE | ||
Former [2010/30] | MÉCANISME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE PORTE | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 23.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.2016
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.2016
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | 18.04.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.08.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.10.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.09.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 24.06.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 22.12.2017 | Appeal received No. T0100/18 | 23.02.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.09.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 18.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2008 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | HR | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | MT | 10.06.2015 | NL | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | SE | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | TR | 10.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | NO | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | AT | 13.11.2015 | IE | 13.11.2015 | LU | 13.11.2015 | BE | 30.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/19] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
AT | 13.11.2015 | ||
IE | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
IE | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 10.06.2015 | |
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 10.06.2015 | |
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4040143 (LASIER THOMAS R, et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,4,8 *; | [X]DE202006017302U (D & H MECHATRONIC AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] *; | [X]DE202004020163U (AUMUELLER AUMATIC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0030] - [0039]; figure - *; | [A]DE102005001314 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * figure 1 * | Opposition | WO9922104 | DE102005001314 | EP1801339 | US4040143 | DE102008004429 | - DIN 18650-1 Schlösser und Baubeschläge - Automatische Türsysteme Teil 1 |