EP2207939 - A CLAMP AND METHOD OF CLAMPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whitby, Alan 8 Hillside Road Kelsall, Cheshire CW6 0NT / GB | [2010/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/29] | Representative(s) | Bray, Richard Anthony, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Bray, Richard Anthony, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 08849457.0 | 11.11.2008 | [2010/29] | WO2008GB03783 | Priority number, date | GB20070022521 | 16.11.2007 Original published format: GB 0722521 | [2010/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009063179 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2207939 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/41, E04B2/88, E04G21/18, F16B2/12, E04B5/32 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
E04B1/4107 (EP,US);
E04B2/88 (EP,US);
E04G15/061 (EP,US);
E04G21/185 (EP,US);
F16B2/12 (EP,US);
E04B2005/322 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/29] | Title | German: | KLEMME UND KLEMMVERFAHREN | [2010/29] | English: | A CLAMP AND METHOD OF CLAMPING | [2010/29] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE SERRAGE | [2010/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 15.06.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB229971 (HEINRICH SCHNEIDER) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,13-15 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1136631 (STOCKER ERNST [IT]) [A] 1-25 * figure 5; claim 1 *; | [PA]WO2008007054 (WHITBY ALAN [GB]) [PA] 1-25 * figures 6a,6b,6d * |