EP2209041 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOH, Ryohki c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
HORIUCHI, Satoshi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2010/29] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08850016.0 | 09.09.2008 | [2010/29] | WO2008JP66251 | Priority number, date | JP20070298575 | 16.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007298575 | [2010/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009063684 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2209041 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1343, G02F1/1368, G02F1/1362 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
G02F1/136286 (EP,US);
G02F1/133707 (EP,US);
G02F1/13606 (EP,US);
G02F2201/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/29] | G02F1/1343, G02F1/1368 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/29] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2010/29] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE | [2010/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2010/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2010 | Translation filed | 11.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 10.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 29.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US7119870 (NISHIKAWA RYUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8 * the whole document * [Y] 7 [I] 6; | [XI]US2007109482 (KIM DONG-GYU [KR]) [X] 1,5,7,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0156] - paragraph [0158] * [I] 2-4,6; | [Y]US2007236414 (LIN HSIANG-LIN [TW]) [Y] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007002253 (KIM HYUN-WUK [KR], et al) [A] 1-6,8 * figures 1-7, 15-17, 19-22 * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0135] * | International search | [A]JP2001194671 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2001215515 (KISHO KODEN KOFUN YUGENKOSHI) | by applicant | JPH04121712 | JP2001281682 |