04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
16.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
08.11.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
06.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
30.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
02.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
24.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
30.11.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
05.11.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.05.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
12.11.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
25.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.08.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.07.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
09.07.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
18.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|