Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011503381 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP08958 | 23.10.2008 | DE102007055052 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2215293 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2013 | B1 | EP2215293 | 11.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP08958 | 23.10.2008 | DE102007055052 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101855395B | 07.12.2011 | B | CN101855395 | 06.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP08958 | 23.10.2008 | DE102007055052 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2397242T | 05.03.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP08958 | 23.10.2008 | DE102007055052 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2478145 | 27.03.2013 | C2 | RU2010123991 | 27.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP08958 | 23.10.2008 | DE102007055052 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009062589 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007055052 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102007055052 | 20.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102007055052 | 16.11.2007 |