EP2220116 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE THERAPY AND DIAGNOSIS OF INFLUENZA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theraclone Sciences, Inc. 1124 Columbia Street, Suite 300 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/34] | For all designated states Spaltudaq Corporation 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANDEA, Andres, G. 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | 02 /
KING, Gordon 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | 03 /
COX, Thomas 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | 04 /
OLSEN, Ole 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | 05 /
MITCHAM, Jennifer 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | 06 /
MOYLE, Matthew 15737 NE 134th Street Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [2012/36] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
GRANDEA, Andres, G. 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | ||
02 /
KING, Gordon 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | |||
03 /
COX, Thomas 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | |||
04 /
OLSEN, Ole 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | |||
05 /
MITCHAM, Jennifer 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | |||
06 /
MOYLE, Matthew 15737 NE 134th Street Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | |||
Former [2010/34] | 01 /
GRANDEA, Andres, G. 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | ||
02 /
KING, Gordon 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | |||
03 /
COX, Thomas 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | |||
04 /
OLSEN, Ole 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | |||
05 /
MITCHAM, Jennifer 1124 Columbia Street Suite 300 Seattle WA 98104 / US | Representative(s) | Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [2013/15] |
Former [2012/36] | Clarke, Victoria Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | ||
Former [2010/34] | Clarke, Victoria Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 08850112.7 | 12.11.2008 | [2010/34] | WO2008US83265 | Priority number, date | US20070987355P | 12.11.2007 Original published format: US 987355 P | US20070987353P | 12.11.2007 Original published format: US 987353 P | US20080053840P | 16.05.2008 Original published format: US 53840 P | US20080095208P | 08.09.2008 Original published format: US 95208 P | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009064805 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2220116 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2220116 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/10, G01N33/569, A61K39/395, A61P31/16, C07K14/11 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
C07K16/1018 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/56983 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR THERAPIE UND DIAGNOSE VON GRIPPE | [2010/34] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE THERAPY AND DIAGNOSIS OF INFLUENZA | [2010/34] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR TRAITER ET DIAGNOSTIQUER LA GRIPPE | [2010/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/34] | 02.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2008 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | HR | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | LU | 12.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LU | 12.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 05.09.2012 | |
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 05.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006061723 (KIRIN BREWERY [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,24-41 * examples 1-6 *; | [A]WO2007031550 (CRUCELL HOLLAND BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-9,14-41 * examples 1-5 *; | [X] - FENG JINGQI ET AL, "Influenza A virus infection engenders a poor antibody response against the ectodomain of matrix protein 2", VIROLOGY JOURNAL, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20061206), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 1743-422X, page 102, XP021025427 [X] 1-9,14-41 * the whole document * * page 106 - page 109 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1743-422X-3-102 | [A] - ZHANG M ET AL, "Fine specificity and sequence of antibodies directed against the ectodomain of matrix protein 2 of influenza A virus", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 43, no. 14, ISSN 0161-5890, (20060701), pages 2195 - 2206, (20060701), XP025037291 [A] 1-9,14-41 * page 2203 - page 2204 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2005.12.015 | [PX] - DE FILETTE MARINA ET AL, "An influenza A vaccine based on tetrameric ectodomain of matrix protein 2.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 25 APR 2008, (20080425), vol. 283, no. 17, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 11382 - 11387, XP002518513 [PX] 1-9,24-41 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.m800650200 | by applicant | US3773919 | EP0183070 | US4683202 | EP0244234 | US4816567 | DD266710 | WO9013646 | EP0402226 | US5053394 | WO9202551 | US5229275 | WO9321232 | WO9411026 | WO9607321 | US5545806 | US5545807 | US5567610 | US5569825 | US5591669 | US5627052 | WO9717852 | US5648237 | US5739116 | US5767285 | US5770701 | US5770710 | US5773001 | US5789199 | US5840523 | US5877296 | US6331415 | US6824780 | US7112439 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 2551 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - BRUGGEMANN ET AL., YEAR IN IMMUNO., (1993), vol. 7, page 33 | - GABIZON ET AL., J. NATIONAL CANCER INST., (1989), vol. 81, no. 19, page 1484 | - "The value of a database in surveillance and vaccine selection", MACKEN ET AL., Options for the Control ofInfluenza IV. A.D.M.E., ELSEVIER SCIENCE, (2001), pages 103 - 106 | - BABCOOK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 7843 - 48 | - PLUCKTHUN ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1989), vol. 178, pages 497 - 515 | - SANGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1977), vol. 74, page 5463 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - YANIV, NATURE, (1982), vol. 297, pages 17 - 18 | - GRAHAM ET AL., J. GEN VIROL., (1977), vol. 36, page 59 | - URLAUB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4216 | - MATHER, BIOL. REPROD., (1980), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER ET AL., ANNALS N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1982), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - MADDOX, D. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1983), vol. 158, pages 1211 - 1216 | - PORATH, J. ET AL., PROT. EXP. PURIF., (1992), vol. 3, pages 263 - 281 | - KROLL, D. J. ET AL., DNA CELL BIOL., (1993), vol. 12, pages 441 - 453 | - CARTER ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167 | - LINDMARK ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1983), vol. 62, pages 1 - 13 | - GUSS ET AL., EMBO J., (1986), vol. 5, page 15671575 |