Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8413458 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2013 | B2 | US2011113818 | 19.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008GB51073 | 17.11.2008 | GB0722501 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011503512 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008GB51073 | 17.11.2008 | GB0722501 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008322683 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008GB51073 | 17.11.2008 | GB0722501 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2225505 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008GB51073 | 17.11.2008 | GB0722501 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2743745 | 22.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008GB51073 | 17.11.2008 | GB0722501 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101861502B | 14.11.2012 | B | CN101861502 | 13.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008GB51073 | 17.11.2008 | GB0722501 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201004159 | 31.08.2011 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2008GB51073 | 17.11.2008 | GB0722501 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009063251 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2009 | A3 | WO2009063251 | 22.05.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0722501 | 16.11.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2457424 | 01.08.2012 | B | GB2457424 | 19.08.2009 | A | GB0722501D0 | 27.12.2007 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0722501 | 16.11.2007 |