EP2197377 - DEVICE FOR REAL-TIME LESION ESTIMATION DURING ABLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/25] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REAL-TIME LESION ESTIMATION DURING ABLATION | ||
[2017/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Jude Medical, Atrial Fibrillation Division, Inc. One St. Jude Medical Drive St. Paul, Minnesota 55117-9913 / US | [2017/44] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states St. Jude Medical, Atrial Fibrillation Division, Inc. One St. Jude Medical Drive St. Paul, Minnesota 55117-9913 / US | ||
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states St. Jude Medical, Atrial Fibrillation Division, Inc. One St. Jude Medical Drive St. Paul, Minnesota 55117-9913 / US | ||
For all designated states Cao, Hong 13511 Hillsboro Avenue Savage, Minnesota 55378 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAUL, Saurav 601 Main Street SE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55414 / US | 02 /
CAO, Hong 13511 Hillsboro Avenue Savage, Minnesota 55378 / US | [2010/44] |
Former [2010/41] | 01 /
PAUL, Saurav 601 Main Street SE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55414 / US | ||
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
PAUL, Saurav 301 Main Street SE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55414 / US | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2017/44] |
Former [2010/25] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08850382.6 | 17.11.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008US83828 | Priority number, date | US20070988734P | 16.11.2007 Original published format: US 988734 P | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009065140 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2197377 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2197377 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12, // A61B18/14, A61B18/00, A61B90/00 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B18/1233 (US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00678 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00779 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00827 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00869 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | A61B18/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/44] |
Former [2010/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ECHTZEITABSCHÄTZUNG VON VERLETZUNGEN WÄHREND ABLATIONEN | [2017/17] | English: | DEVICE FOR REAL-TIME LESION ESTIMATION DURING ABLATION | [2017/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'ESTIMATION DES LÉSIONS EN TEMPS RÉEL EN COURS D'ABLATION | [2017/17] |
Former [2010/25] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ECHTZEITABSCHÄTZUNG VON VERLETZUNGEN WÄHREND ABLATIONEN | ||
Former [2010/25] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REAL-TIME LESION ESTIMATION DURING ABLATION | ||
Former [2010/25] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ESTIMATION DES LÉSIONS EN TEMPS RÉEL EN COURS D'ABLATION | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 06.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2008 | AT | 01.11.2017 | CY | 01.11.2017 | CZ | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | ES | 01.11.2017 | FI | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | NL | 01.11.2017 | PL | 01.11.2017 | PT | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | TR | 01.11.2017 | IE | 17.11.2017 | LU | 17.11.2017 | MT | 17.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | BG | 01.02.2018 | NO | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 17.11.2008 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.11.2008 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 01.11.2017 | |
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002068931 (WONG YEE CHIN [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [I]US6423057 (HE DING SHENG [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * claims 1, 2 * * column 4, line 35 - column 9, line 57; figures 3, 6, 8, 10 *; | [A]WO2006079524 (ERBE ELEKTROMEDIZIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2007049915 (HAEMMERICH DIETER [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * figures 1,4,5,7, 8a,8b,9 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0066] *; | [Y]WO2007067628 (ST JUDE MEDICAL ATRIAL FIBRILL [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * figures 1, 3, 5-8 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0071] *; | [A] - HOFFMANN E ET AL, "Biophysical parameters of radiofrequency catheter ablation", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CARDIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 37, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0167-5273(92)90211-K, ISSN 0167-5273, (19921101), pages 213 - 222, (19921101), XP023160109 [A] 1,3,9-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-5273(92)90211-K | [A] - BOSNOS M ET AL, "Assessment of myocardial lesion size during in vitro radio frequency catheter ablation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20030601), vol. 50, no. 6, doi:10.1109/TBME.2003.812161, ISSN 0018-9294, pages 768 - 776, XP011097432 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2003.812161 | International search | [Y]US2003236487 (KNOWLTON EDWARD W [US]); | [X]US2007049915 (HAEMMERICH DIETER [US], et al); | [X]WO2007067628 (ST JUDE MEDICAL ATRIAL FIBRILL [US], et al); | [Y]US7282049 (ORSZULAK JAMES H [US], et al) |