EP2219503 - FRYING DEVICE. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marel Townsend Further Processing B.V. Handelstraat 3 5831 AV Boxmeer / NL | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER EERDEN, Hendricus Franciscus Jacobus Maria 120 Vondellaan NL-5421 PS Gemert / NL | 02 /
WILLEMS, Mattheus, Catharina 10 De Beethof NL-5673 LV Nuenen / NL | [2012/16] |
Former [2010/34] | 01 /
VAN DER EERDEN, Hendricus Franciscus Jacobus Maria 120 Vondellaan NL-5421 PS Gemert / NL | ||
02 /
WILLEMS, Mattheus, Catharina 10 De Beethof NL-5673 LV Nuenen / NL | Representative(s) | Hollaar, Cornelis Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Hollaar, Cornelis Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [2010/34] | Hollaar, Cornelis EP&C Postbus 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 08850955.9 | 14.11.2008 | [2010/34] | WO2008NL00252 | Priority number, date | NL20071034711 | 16.11.2007 Original published format: NL 1034711 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009064176 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2219503 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2219503 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/12 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
A47J37/1214 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | BRATVORRICHTUNG | [2010/34] | English: | FRYING DEVICE. | [2010/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FRITURE. | [2010/34] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/34] | 16.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2008 | AT | 18.04.2012 | BE | 18.04.2012 | CY | 18.04.2012 | CZ | 18.04.2012 | EE | 18.04.2012 | FI | 18.04.2012 | HR | 18.04.2012 | IT | 18.04.2012 | LT | 18.04.2012 | LV | 18.04.2012 | MT | 18.04.2012 | PL | 18.04.2012 | RO | 18.04.2012 | SI | 18.04.2012 | SK | 18.04.2012 | TR | 18.04.2012 | BG | 18.07.2012 | NO | 18.07.2012 | GR | 19.07.2012 | ES | 29.07.2012 | IS | 18.08.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | IE | 14.11.2012 | LU | 14.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LU | 14.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
IE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
ES | 29.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
IT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.04.2012 | |
BE | 18.04.2012 | ||
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 18.04.2012 | |
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 18.04.2012 | |
NO | 18.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB854057 (KESTNER EVAPORATOR AND ENGINEE) [X] 14,15 * page 1, line 55 - page 2, line 37 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1; | [XA]WO9103973 (STEIN INC [US]) [X] 14,15 * page 5, line 15 - page 7, line 29 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1; | [A]JPH06105753 (YANAGYA KK) [A] 1 * abstract ** figures 1-4 *; | [DXA]US2001029846 (NOTHUM ROBERT G [US]) [DX] 14,15 * page 3, paragraph 30 * * page 4, paragraph 50 - page 5, paragraph 57 * * page 6, paragraph 70 - paragraph 71 * * figures 4a,4b,9a * [A] 1; | [XA]US2002006460 (HWANG YOUNG Y [US]) [X] 14,15 * page 2, paragraph 21 * * page 2, line 21, paragraph 22 - line 30, paragraph 22 * * page 3, paragraph 23 * * figure 1 * [A] 1 |