|
27.01.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.01.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
25.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Cover letter for submission of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.08.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2010 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |